Brown v. Michigan, State of et al
Plaintiff: Antrel Vonique Brown, Antrell Vonique Brown and Islamic Ali
Defendant: Michigan, State of, State Department of Corrections, Dana Nessel, Heidi E. Washington, P. Davis and K. Buckingham
Case Number: 1:2021cv00849
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/22/2021 (mg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from New York Northern, their case number 9:21-cv-00764; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (mg)
October 1, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Antrell Vonique Brown #367927 (mg)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECISION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), the Clerk of the Court transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court advise the Clerk of the Western District of Michigan of the entry of this Decision and Order and provide all information necessary for the Clerk of that District to electronically access the documents filed in this action; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a hearing regarding his assets (Dkt. No. #8 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in the Western District of Michigan; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on September 16, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement submitted in support of plaintiff's #7 IFP Motion, filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER: Filed by Antrel Vonique Brown in support of his #8 Letter Motion. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION: Filed by Antrel Vonique Brown, requesting a hearing on whether or not he can put up assets for his filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, either: (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; (2) submit a completed, signed, and certified IFP application; or (3) submit a completed and signed IFP application along with certified copies of his inmate account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court and the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on July 28, 2021. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on July 26, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff).(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. {Mailing envelope attached}.(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. It is hereby ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that, if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff chooses to file an IFP application, it must be accompanied by a signed inmate authorization form in accordance with the Court's Local Rules; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application and blank inmate authorization form. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on July 7, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application and blank Inmate Authorization Form).(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against K. Buckingham, P. Davis, Dana Nessel, State Department of Corrections, State of Michigan, Heidi E. Washington. Filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rep) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Michigan, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antrel Vonique Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antrell Vonique Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islamic Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?