Zelmer v. Merrill et al
Plaintiff: David R. Zelmer
Defendant: Kristin M. Merrill and Amber Glendening
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2021cv00916
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Sally J Berens
2 Judge: Robert J Jonker
3 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting STIPULATION #37 ; extending ADR deadline; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
November 23, 2022 Filing 37 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Mediation Deadline by defendants Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill (Rothermel, Scott)
November 4, 2022 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill for Notice of taking Deposition of Plaintiff David R. Zelmer #510885 (Rothermel, Scott)
September 21, 2022 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Plaintiff's Expert Witness Reports re Fed.R.Civ.P 26(a)(2)(B) (Buckleitner, Anne)
August 31, 2022 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Pl Notice of Taking Deposition of Don Matson for the Michigan Department of Corrections (Buckleitner, Anne)
June 23, 2022 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Plaintiff's Disclosure of Retained Expert Witnesses Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)(A) (Buckleitner, Anne)
June 14, 2022 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Plaintiff's Third Notice of Taking Deposition of M Longley, LMSW, LCSW (Buckleitner, Anne)
May 27, 2022 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Plaintiff's Second Notice of Taking Deposition of Melissa Longley, LMSW, LCSW (Buckleitner, Anne)
May 4, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill for Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Rothermel, Scott) Modified text on 5/4/2022 (eod)
April 7, 2022 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Buckleitner, Anne)
April 1, 2022 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill for Defendants documents provided to Plaintiffs' counsel, Pursuant to the courts Order #24 (Rothermel, Scott) Modified text on 4/1/2022 (eod)
March 18, 2022 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 86447 as to plaintiff David R. Zelmer (mkc)
March 18, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff David R. Zelmer for Plaintiff's Notice of Taking Depositions of Kristin M. Merrill, and Melissa Longley, LMSW, LCSW (Buckleitner, Anne)
March 11, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Frederick D. Dilley ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 3/18/2022 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 3/18/2022 (mkc)
March 10, 2022 Filing 25 SELECTION of Frederick D. Dilley as facilitative mediator by plaintiff David R. Zelmer (Buckleitner, Anne)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
February 25, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: (not recorded)) (rmw)
February 17, 2022 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Buckleitner, Anne)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/25/2022 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 2/18/2022; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
January 10, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand with a Certificate of Service by Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill (Rothermel, Scott) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (eod)
January 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Jane M. Beckering under #Administrative Order No. 22-CA-01 ; Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker is no longer assigned to the case (mlc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand with a Certificate of Service by Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill (Rothermel, Scott)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting STIPULATION #15 extending time for MDOC Defendant Glendening to respond to complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 2/10/2022 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time for MDOC defendant Glendening to respond to plaintiffs' complaint by defendant Amber Glendening (Rothermel, Scott) Modified text on 11/23/2021 (eod)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Amber Glendening (Rothermel, Scott)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Amber Glendening re Attorney Appearance (Rothermel, Scott)
November 22, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Richard Rothermel on behalf of defendant Amber Glendening (Rothermel, Scott)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Kristin M. Merrill served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/29/2021 (Buckleitner, Anne) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (eod)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Amber Glendening served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021 (Buckleitner, Anne) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (eod)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting STIPULATION #9 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time for MDOC defendant Merrill to respond to plaintiffs' complaint by defendant Kristin M. Merrill (Rothermel, Scott) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (eod)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Kristin M. Merrill (Rothermel, Scott)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kristin M. Merrill re Attorney Appearance (Rothermel, Scott)
November 15, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Richard Rothermel on behalf of defendant Kristin M. Merrill (Rothermel, Scott)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker for all further proceedings pursuant to Order 5 by Judge Maloney; Judge Maloney no longer assigned to the case (eod)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: District Judge Paul L. Maloney recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Amber Glendening, Kristin M. Merrill (eod)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (eod)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Buckleitner, Anne)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David R Zelmer (Buckleitner, Anne)
October 29, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff David R Zelmer in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6582396 (Buckleitner, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelmer v. Merrill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Zelmer
Represented By: Anne L. Buckleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin M. Merrill
Represented By: Scott Richard Rothermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Glendening
Represented By: Scott Richard Rothermel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Frederick D. Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?