Blunt #252203 v. Gleason
Plaintiff: James A. Blunt #252203
Defendant: Michael Gleason
Case Number: 1:2021cv00924
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #5 (affidavit) by plaintiff James A. Blunt #252203 (slk)
November 29, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to James A. Blunt (slk)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.11 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff James A. Blunt #252203 regarding status of case; (mailed docket sheet) (slk)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity and Transaction Summary submitted by plaintiff James A. Blunt #252203 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff James A. Blunt #252203 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (mlc)
November 4, 2021 Copy of Deficiency Order #3 sent via U.S. Mail to James A. Blunt (slk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 12/1/2021 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
November 3, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to James A. Blunt (slk)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Gleason filed by James A. Blunt #252203 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blunt #252203 v. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Blunt #252203
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?