Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County et al v. Burns et al
Plaintiff: Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County, Jennifer Wortz and Stacy Wohlheter
Defendant: Rebecca Burns, Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency and Reading Community Schools
Case Number: 1:2021cv00959
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding settlement conference: early settlement conference set for 1/24/2022 at 01:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; Defendants' deadline to file a reply is extended to 2/7/2022; this matter is STAYED pending the completion of the Early Settlement Conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of omnibus hearing via Zoom; Order to issue regarding settlement conference (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss #7 , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #8 RESPONSE filed by Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County, Stacy Wohlheter, Jennifer Wortz (Wiseley, Daren)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge ; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jep)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Comstock, Travis)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re Notice (Other), #3 of Removal by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavits, #2 Attachment 2 - Order Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Attachment 3 - Register of Actions) (Brege, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/17/2021 at 11:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 12/14/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss #7 filed by Reading Community Schools (Comstock, Travis)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #8 Index of Unpublished Authority by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - City of Streetsboro v Fraternal Ord. of Police, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fratarcangeli v Myers, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hartwell v Houghton Lake Cmty. Sch, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jones-Bey v Michigan Dept of Corr, #5 Exhibit 5 - Martinko v Whitmer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pleasant View Baptist Church v Beshear, #7 Exhibit 7 - Ready for the World v Riley, #8 Exhibit 8 - Roath v Lee, #9 Exhibit 9 - Roberts v Beshear, #10 Exhibit 10 - S. Wind Women's Ctr v Stitt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Thompson v Whitmer, #12 Exhibit 12 - Martinko v Whitmer, #13 Exhibit 13 - Resurrection Sch. v Hertel) (Brege, Andrew)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #8 with Proof of Service filed by Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sept 3 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sept 22 Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Wohlheter Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Denial of TRO) (Brege, Andrew)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns; (Brege, Andrew)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss by defendant Reading Community Schools; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Comstock, Travis)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the removing Defendants shall file copies of all records and proceedings of the state court in this matter as a supplement to the original Notice of Removal #1 no later than 11/29/2021; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
November 15, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexandra Lee Page on behalf of defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Page, Alexandra)
November 15, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas David Beindit on behalf of defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Beindit, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (eod)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns re Notice (Other), #3 (Brege, Andrew)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Ex Parte Request to Accept Amended Pleadings in Place of the Original Notice of Removal and Associated Records Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(A) by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Ex 1 - State Summons & Complaint) (Brege, Andrew)
November 11, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Travis Mark Comstock on behalf of defendant Reading Community Schools (Comstock, Travis)
November 11, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of defendant Reading Community Schools (Mullins, Timothy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns re Notice of Removal, #1 (Brege, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsdale County Circuit Court case number 21-706-CZ filed by Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet) (Brege, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency, Rebecca Burns in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6592951 (Brege, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County et al v. Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moms for Liberty Branch and Hillsdale County
Represented By: Daren A. Wiseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wortz
Represented By: Daren A. Wiseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Wohlheter
Represented By: Daren A. Wiseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Burns
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Alexandra Lee Page
Represented By: Thomas David Beindit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch-Hillsdale-St. Joseph Community Health Agency
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Alexandra Lee Page
Represented By: Thomas David Beindit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reading Community Schools
Represented By: Timothy J. Mullins
Represented By: Travis Mark Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?