Jaiyeola v. Brundage
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola
Defendant: Robert A. Brundage
Case Number: 1:2021cv01053
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Robert A. Brundage re Response to Motion #33 for Leave (Wolock, Steven)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file a motion for reconsideration of Memorandum and Order #25 , along with certificate of service #30 filed by Robert A. Brundage (Wolock, Steven)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #29 indicating case number 22-1083 has been assigned to the appeal (pjw)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice of Appeal #29 , along with court docket sheet, sent via U.S. Mail to Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw) Modified text on 2/10/2022 (pjw).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a motion for reconsideration of Memorandum and Order #25 , along with certificate of service #30 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to file a motion for reconsideration of Opinion and Order #25 , along with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (pjw) Modified text on 2/9/2022 (pjw).
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #26 by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REJECTING Motion for leave to file Motion for default judgment submitted by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (jln)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OBJECTION by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola to Report and Recommendation #11 (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (pjw)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #11 ; Motion for leave to file objections #12 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's motions #5 , #6 , #7 , #14 , #16 , #20 , #22 and #23 are DENIED as moot; Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Judgment #26 and copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #25 sent via U.S. Mail to Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #28 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (jmw)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Motion requesting clerk's ruling on and grant of plaintiff's motion for clerk's entry of default against defendant with certificate of service #23 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for leave to file Motion requesting clerk's ruling on and grant of plaintiff's motion for clerk's entry of default against defendant with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (pjw)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for leave to file motion for entry of default with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Index EX A, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Motion for Default, #3 Proposed Document Index-EX A) (pjw)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert A. Brundage re Attorney Appearance, Waiver of Service Executed #18 (Wolock, Steven)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a Notice: Affidavit of service of summons, civil cover sheet, complaint with certificate of service #20 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for leave to file a Notice: Affidavit of service of summons, civil cover sheet, complaint with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (pjw)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Robert A. Brundage as to Robert A. Brundage waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 (Wolock, Steven)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven M. Wolock on behalf of defendant Robert A. Brundage (Wolock, Steven)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a Notice: "Plaintiff's proper service of process on defendant Robert Allen Brundage" with certificate of service #16 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for leave to file a Notice: "Plaintiff's proper service of process on defendant Robert Allen Brundage" with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (pjw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a Notice: Plaintiff has requested for an amicus brief from the State Bar of Michigan regarding magistrate judge's "Report and Recommendation;" ECF No. 11; certificate of service #14 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw) Modified text on 1/12/2022 (pjw).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for leave to file a Notice: Plaintiff has requested for an amicus brief from the State Bar of Michigan regarding magistrate judge's "Report and Recommendation;" ECF No. 11; certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (pjw) Modified text on 1/12/2022 (pjw).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS REISSUED as to Robert A. Brundage at GR Clerk's office front counter, per plaintiff's request (pjw) Modified text on 1/10/2022 (pjw).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Objections to Report and Recommendation with certificate of service #12 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw) Modified date filed on 1/12/2022 (jmw).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for leave to file Objections to Report and Recommendation with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Objections) (pjw)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Report and Recommendation #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court dismiss this matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file a notice regarding service of summons and complaint with certificate of service #7 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (pjw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Notice of Facts with certificate of service #5 filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file motion for removal with certificate of service #6 with certificate of service filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for leave to file a notice regarding service of summons and complaint with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (pjw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for leave to file motion for removal with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A) (pjw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for leave to file Notice of Facts with certificate of service by plaintiff Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Index of Exhibits 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D) (pjw)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (pjw)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Robert A. Brundage and handed to plaintiff over the counter in Grand Rapids(pjw) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (pjw), Modified text on 12/17/2021 (jmw).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 handed to Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola over the counter at the Clerk's Office in Grand Rapids (jmw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens indicating that this case related to 1:17-cv-562 (pjw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Robert A. Brundage filed by Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 civil cover sheet, #13 proposed summons) (pjw)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number GR075731; for filing fee (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaiyeola v. Brundage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Ganiyu Ayinla Jaiyeola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Brundage
Represented By: Steven M. Wolock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?