Nessel v. Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Dana Nessel
Defendant: Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. and Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2021cv01057
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. for Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand (Ellsworth, Peter)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 motion for relief from Order to Strike; Order to Strike #12 is VACATED; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 4, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for relief from Order to Strike #14 filed by Dana Nessel (Reichel, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION for relief from Order to Strike #14 filed by Dana Nessel (Reichel, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for relief from Order to Strike by plaintiff Dana Nessel; (Reichel, Robert)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Dana Nessel for Motion for Remand and Brief in Support (Reichel, Robert)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (VACATED) ORDER STRIKING Motion and Brief #10 and #11 ; Plaintiff shall re-file the motion and brief once the motion is fully briefed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text per Order #17 on 2/8/2022 (ems).
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #10 filed by Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Register of Actions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Motion for Summary Disposition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Ingham County Circuit Court, #4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Supplemental Brief) (Reichel, Robert) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (ems). Modified text per Order #12 on 1/18/2022 (ems). Modified text per Order #17 on 2/8/2022 (ems).
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to remand by plaintiff Dana Nessel; (Reichel, Robert) Modified text per Order #12 on 1/18/2022 (ems). Modified text per Order #17 on 2/8/2022 (ems).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Pre-motion Conference Request #7 setting forth the briefing schedule re anticipated motion to remand; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 4, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark Christopher Savignac on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Savignac, Mark)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Dana Nessel #7 ; filed by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Briefing Schedule) (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certified copy of Defendants' Motion for Summary Disposition filed in the Ingham County Circuit Court, dated September 16, 2019, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certified copy of Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Disposition filed in the Ingham County Circuit Court, dated June 22, 2020, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Proposed Briefing Schedule) (Reichel, Robert)
December 21, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert P. Reichel on behalf of plaintiff Dana Nessel (Reichel, Robert)
December 21, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Paul Bock on behalf of plaintiff Dana Nessel (Bock, Daniel)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Ray Kent indicating that this case is related to cases 1:20-cv-1141 and 1:20-cv-1142 (jmw)
December 20, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William T. Hassler on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Hassler, William)
December 20, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Hyler Coburn on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Coburn, David)
December 20, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua H. Runyan on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Runyan, Joshua)
December 20, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alice Loughran on behalf of defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership, Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Loughran, Alice)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge, Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Management, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Corporate Parent Enbridge Pipelines (Lakehead), L.L.C., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. for Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (ems).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge, Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge (U.S.), Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Energy Management, L.L.C. for Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge, Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge (U.S.), Inc. for Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. (Ellsworth, Peter)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ingham County Circuit Court case number 19-474-CE filed by Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Attachment Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Ellsworth, Peter) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (ems).
December 15, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6619962 [Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. DeRosier added to party Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership(pty:dft)] (DeRosier, Phillip) Modified text on 12/20/2021 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nessel v. Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Represented By: Robert P. Reichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Mark Christopher Savignac
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Mark Christopher Savignac
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Limited Partnership
Represented By: Alice Loughran
Represented By: David Hyler Coburn
Represented By: Joshua H. Runyan
Represented By: Mark Christopher Savignac
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Represented By: William T. Hassler
Represented By: Peter H. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?