CJ Consultants LLC v. Window World, Inc.
Plaintiff: CJ Consultants LLC, CJ Consultants, LLC doing business as Window World of Lansing, James Hindman, Cynthia Hindman, Hugh Stempfley and Paulette Stempfley
Defendant: Window World, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call instructions for 4/19/2022 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for CJ Consultants, LLC, Cynthia Hindman, James Hindman, Hugh Stempfley, Paulette Stempfley, Window World, Inc. only] (jal)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/19/2022 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 4/13/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #10 filed by Window World, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2012 Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Amendment to Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Case - LoanCraft LLC v. First Choice Loan Servs., #4 Exhibit D - Case - Hometown Servs. v. EquityLock Solutions Inc., #5 Exhibit E - Case - Sohmer v. Hwang, #6 Exhibit F - Case - Trone Health Servs. Inc. v. Express Scripts Holding Co., #7 Exhibit G - Case - Allegra Network LLC v. Alpha Omega Print & Imaging Inc., #8 Exhibit H - Case - Shaheen Hyundai Motors Inc. v. Hyundai Motor Am.) (Cherry, William)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Window World, Inc.; (Cherry, William)
February 18, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William S. Cherry, III on behalf of defendant Window World, Inc. (Cherry, William)
February 18, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jessica Blair Vickers on behalf of defendant Window World, Inc. (Vickers, Jessica)
January 14, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ari Stern on behalf of plaintiffs CJ Consultants, LLC, Cynthia Hindman, James Hindman, Hugh Stempfley, Paulette Stempfley (Stern, Ari)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting STIPULATION #8 : Defendant to respond to complaint by 2/25/2022; no further extensions; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
January 13, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend defendant's response date for the plaintiff's complaint by defendant Window World, Inc. (McAskin, James) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (pjw).
January 13, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James M. McAskin on behalf of defendant Window World, Inc. as local counsel (McAskin, James)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Window World, Inc. served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (Burkholder, Evan)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit 9 to Complaint by plaintiffs CJ Consultants, LLC, Cynthia Hindman, James Hindman, Hugh Stempfley, Paulette Stempfley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Burkholder, Evan)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Window World, Inc. (pjw)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Burkholder, Evan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CJ Consultants, LLC (Burkholder, Evan) Modified filers on 1/4/2022 (pjw).
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (pjw)
January 4, 2022 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Window World, Inc. (none provided and fee due) (pjw)
January 4, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs CJ Consultants, LLC, Cynthia Hindman, James Hindman, Hugh Stempfley, Paulette Stempfley in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6631140 (Burkholder, Evan)
January 4, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Evan Alfred Burkholder on behalf of plaintiffs CJ Consultants, LLC, Cynthia Hindman, James Hindman, Hugh Stempfley, Paulette Stempfley (Burkholder, Evan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Window World, Inc. filed by all plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 01, #3 Exhibit 02, #4 Exhibit 03, #5 Exhibit 04, #6 Exhibit 05, #7 Exhibit 06, #8 Exhibit 07, #9 Exhibit 08, #10 Exhibit 09, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21) (Burkholder, Evan) Modified text on 1/4/2022 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CJ Consultants LLC v. Window World, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ Consultants LLC
Represented By: Evan Alfred Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJ Consultants, LLC doing business as Window World of Lansing
Represented By: Evan Alfred Burkholder
Represented By: Ari Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hindman
Represented By: Ari Stern
Represented By: Evan Alfred Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hindman
Represented By: Ari Stern
Represented By: Evan Alfred Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Stempfley
Represented By: Ari Stern
Represented By: Evan Alfred Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Stempfley
Represented By: Ari Stern
Represented By: Evan Alfred Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Window World, Inc.
Represented By: James M. McAskin
Represented By: Jessica Blair Vickers
Represented By: William S. Cherry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?