Acrisure, LLC v. Hudak
Plaintiff: Acrisure, LLC
Defendant: Marc Hudak
Case Number: 1:2022cv00017
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #22 filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Answer with Counterclaims), #2 Exhibit 2 (NY Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 (Settlement Agreement), #4 Exhibit 4 (Employment Agreement)) (Angelillo, Robert)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Monsma, Timothy)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 3/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 3/4/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #22 filed by Acrisure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Monsma, Timothy)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by counter-defendant Acrisure, LLC, plaintiff Acrisure, LLC; (Monsma, Timothy)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #11 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert Angelillo on behalf of defendant Marc Hudak, counter-claimant Marc Hudak (Angelillo, Robert)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #5 motion to remand; denying as moot #15 motion to expedite; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE TO MOTION to expedite consideration of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] and supplemental authority in support of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] #15 filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Subpoenas) (Sternheim, Isaac)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE TO MOTION to remand #5 filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Emails December 7 and 8, 2021, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order to Show Cause, #5 Exhibit 4 - Acrisure, LLC's Supplemental Information, #6 Exhibit 5 - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 - Answer, #8 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Removal - Michigan State Court, #9 Exhibit 8 - Amended Notice of Removal, #10 Affidavit Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Marc Hudak, 1/31/2022) (Sternheim, Isaac)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to expedite consideration of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] and supplemental authority in support of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] #15 filed by Acrisure, LLC (Monsma, Timothy)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BRIEF in support of MOTION to expedite consideration of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] and supplemental authority in support of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] #15 filed by Acrisure, LLC (Monsma, Timothy)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to expedite consideration of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] and supplemental authority in support of motion to remand [ECF No. 5] by counter-defendant Acrisure, LLC, plaintiff Acrisure, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Monsma, Timothy)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: response to Motion to Remand #5 due by 1/31/2022; response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #11 due by 2/7/2022; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order , order to show cause and preliminary injunction #11 filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Sternheim, Isaac) Modified text on 1/24/2022 (ems).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION for temporary restraining order , order to show cause and preliminary injunction #11 filed by Acrisure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Monsma, Timothy)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for temporary restraining order , order to show cause and preliminary injunction by counter-defendant Acrisure, LLC, plaintiff Acrisure, LLC; (Monsma, Timothy)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Michigan 17th Circuit Court (Kent County) case number 21-11147-CB filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acrisure Filing (Harrington), #3 Exhibit C - Email Exchange) (Sternheim, Isaac) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (ems).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Acrisure, LLC by Marc Hudak (Sternheim, Isaac)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORRECTED BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #5 (corrected to include exhibit identifiers) filed by Acrisure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - 12/7/21 Email from S. Ohnegian, #4 Exhibit Corrected C - 12/7/21 Email from R. Angelillo, #5 Exhibit D - Proof of Service, #6 Exhibit E - 12/1/21 Email from R. Angelillo, #7 Exhibit F - Motion for TRO, #8 Exhibit G - 1/7/22 Email from R. Dindoffer, #9 Exhibit H - 1/10/22 Letter from T. Monsma, #10 Exhibit I - 1/10/22 Letter from R. Angelillo, #11 Exhibit J - Amended Complaint) (Monsma, Timothy) Modified text on 1/14/2022; this entry replaces #6 (ems).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to attorney Timothy Paul Monsma regarding recent filing #6 (ems)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #5 filed by Acrisure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - 12/7/21 Email from S. Ohegian, #4 Exhibit C - 12/7/21 Email from R. Angelillo, #5 Exhibit D - Proof of Service, #6 Exhibit E - 12/1/21 Email from R. Angelillo, #7 Exhibit F - Motion For TRO, #8 Exhibit G - 1/7/2 Email from R. Dindoffer, #9 Exhibit H - 1/10/22 Letter from T. Monsma, #10 Exhibit I - 1/10/11 Letter from R. Angelillo, #11 Exhibit J - Amended Complaint, #12 Certificate of Compliance) (Monsma, Timothy)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to remand by plaintiff Acrisure, LLC; (Monsma, Timothy)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert J. Dindoffer on behalf of defendant Marc Hudak (Dindoffer, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Isaac Sternheim on behalf of defendant Marc Hudak (Sternheim, Isaac)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant to show cause by 1/24/2022 or case will be remanded; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID re #2 , #1 by defendant Marc Hudak in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6636849 (Pendleton, Abby)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Circuit Court of Michigan (Kent County) case number 21-11147-CB filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A and B - State Court Complaint and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pendleton, Abby) Modified text on 1/7/2022; this entry replaces #1 (ems).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Michigan 17th Circuit Court (Kent County) case number 21-11147-CB filed by Marc Hudak (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A and B - State Court Complaint and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pendleton, Abby) Modified text on 1/7/2022 (ems).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy Paul Monsma on behalf of plaintiff Acrisure, LLC (Monsma, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acrisure, LLC v. Hudak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acrisure, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Paul Monsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Hudak
Represented By: Abby Pendleton
Represented By: Isaac Sternheim
Represented By: Robert Angelillo
Represented By: Robert J. Dindoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?