Altman v. UM Health et al
Plaintiff: Cherylynne E Altman and Cherylynne E. Altman
Defendant: UM Health, Metropolitan Hospital and Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan
Case Number: 1:2022cv00098
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 13 CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cherylynne E. Altman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B (Dickinson, Todd) Modified text on 3/30/2022; this entry replaces #10 (mlc).
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to attorney Todd R. Dickinson regarding recent filing #10 (mlc)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER dismissing motion to dismiss #7 as moot; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (with Exhibits A and B) against All Defendants filed by Cherylynne E. Altman (Dickinson, Todd)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff must file either an amended complaint or a response to the motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #7 with certificate of compliance filed by Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Hospital, UM Health (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1-Plan Document) (Hamilton, K.) Modified text on 3/8/2022 (mlc).
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Hospital, UM Health; (Hamilton, K.)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting STIPULATION #5 ; Defendants' response to the Complaint due by 3/7/2022; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Hospital, UM Health (Hamilton, K.)
February 9, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of K. Scott Hamilton on behalf of defendants Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Hospital, UM Health (Hamilton, K.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Hospital, UM Health (mlc)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Dickinson, Todd)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Jane M. Beckering (mlc)
February 2, 2022 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Hospital, UM Health (Summons Not Provided) (mlc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cherylynne E Altman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Physician Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Physician Employment Agreement) (Dickinson, Todd) Modified text on 2/2/2022 (mlc).
February 1, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Cherylynne E Altman in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6655677 (Dickinson, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altman v. UM Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherylynne E Altman
Represented By: Todd R. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherylynne E. Altman
Represented By: Todd R. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UM Health
Represented By: K. Scott Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Hospital
Represented By: K. Scott Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Health Hospital Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: K. Scott Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?