Miller v. Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Miller and Todd K Lamunyon
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., John Does 1 - 30, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Mark W. Kowlzan, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla, Robert P. Mundy and Pamela A. Barnes
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2022cv00271
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECLARATION re #75 of Todd K Lamunyon by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION re #75 of Harvey Miller by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION re #75 of Paul M. Secunda in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Secunda Decl. - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit A to Settlement Agreement - Proposed Final Approval Order, #3 Exhibit B-1 to Settlement Agreement - Current Class Member Notice, #4 Exhibit B-2 to Settlement Agreement - Former Class Member Notice, #5 Exhibit C to Settlement Agreement - Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, #6 Exhibit D to Settlement Agreement - Proposed CAFA Notice, #7 Exhibit 2 to Secunda Decl. - Mediator Profile, #8 Exhibit 3 to Secunda Decl. - Analytics Profile) (Secunda, Paul)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for settlement (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller; (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (Secunda, Paul)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting #73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to withdraw as attorney by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Glickstein, Jed)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case #72 sent via U.S. Mail to Alex C. Latakos (eod)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting #71 : staying case; parties to file motion for preliminary approval of settlement by 9/22/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller and Request for Stay (Secunda, Paul)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time #65 sent via U.S. Mail to Alex C. Latakos (eod)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION re #66 of Todd K. Lamunyon in Support of Motion to Certify Class by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION re #66 of Harvey Miller in Support of Motion to Certify Class by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECLARATION re #66 of Paul M. Secunda in Support of Motion to Certify Class by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2021 Plan Form 5500 with Audited Financials, #2 Exhibit B - March 2016 Plan Annual Fee Disclosure) (Secunda, Paul)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to certify class #66 filed by Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to certify class by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller; (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Secunda, Paul)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying #64 motion for extension of time; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file class action certification motion by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller; (Secunda, Paul)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss,, #62 filed by Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 6/15/2023 (eod)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to dismiss by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 6/15/2023 (eod)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alex C. Lakatos on behalf of defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Lakatos, Alex)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ATTORNEY Alex C. Lakatos ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (mkc)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 motion for extension of time to answer by 6/14/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou. (bgs)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #61 sent via U.S. Mail to Alex C. Latakos (mlc)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #59 by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Liu, Elaine) Modified text on 5/25/2023 (eod)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time #58 , Order on Motion for Leave to File #57 sent via U.S. Mail to Alex C. Latakos (eod)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed per Order #57 ) against All Defendants filed by Harvey Miller, Todd K Lamunyon (eod)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #55 motion for extension of time to hold facilitative mediation; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #53 motion for leave to file (53-1); signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Alex C. Lakatos; attorney admission deadline set for 6/14/2023; (eod)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINT MOTION for extension of time to hold facilitative mediation by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller; (Secunda, Paul)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re CORRECTED MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint #53 filed by Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CORRECTED MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Secunda, Paul)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying without prejudice #51 motion for leave to file; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint #50 (Corrected Motion for Leave) by plaintiffs Todd K Lamunyon, Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint by plaintiffs Harvey Miller, Todd K Lamunyon; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Secunda, Paul)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Elaine Liu on behalf of defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Liu, Elaine)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #14 with affirmative defenses by Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 4/28/2023 (eod)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 motion for extension of time to answer to 4/27/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #14 by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 4/5/2023 (eod)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #28 motion to dismiss; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hughes v. Northwestern II) (Secunda, Paul)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lucero v. CUNA) (Secunda, Paul)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE re #28 of Supplemental Authorities by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ruilova v. Yale-New Haven Hospital, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brown v. Mitre) (Secunda, Paul)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE re #28 of Third Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Probst v. Eli Lilly & Co. Opinion, #2 Exhibit B - Sigetich v. The Kroger Co. Opinion) (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 3/13/2023 (eod)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE TO #38 (Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority ) filed by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE to attorney Nancy Ross regarding recent filing #38 (slk)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE re #28 (Defendants' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Riley v. Olin Corp., #2 Exhibit B - Locascio v. Fluor Corp., #3 Exhibit C - Singh v. Deloitte LLP) (Ross, Nancy)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE TO #36 filed by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nohara v. Prevea Clinic R&R and Order, #2 Exhibit B - Glick v. ThedaCare R&R and Order, #3 Exhibit C - Laabs v. Faith Techs. R&R and Letter) (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 11/21/2022 (eod)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE re #28 of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Munson Opinion and Order) (Secunda, Paul)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Coyer Decision) (Secunda, Paul)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE re #28 of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matousek v. MidAmerican Energy Co. (CA8 Opinion)) (Ross, Nancy) Modified text on 10/18/2022 (eod)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 motion to withdraw as attorney; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to withdraw as attorney by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bartine, Abigail)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to response to motion #28 to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla (Ross, Nancy)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint #28 filed by Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss,, #28 filed by Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Ross, Nancy)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint by defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Michelle Wojdyla; (Ross, Nancy)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 4224 as to plaintiff Harvey Miller (jmw)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1207681 as to defendants Pamela A. Barnes, Cheryl K. Beebe, Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Duane Farrington, Donna A. Harman, Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W. Kowlzan, Robert C. Lyons, Thomas P. Maurer, Samuel M. Mencoff, Robert P. Mundy, Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Roger B. Porter, Thomas A. Souleles, Paul T. Stecko, The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Unknown Part(y)(ies), Michelle Wojdyla (jmw)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Robert A. Meyer; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 7/29/2022 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 7/29/2022 (kmd)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #27 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert A. Meyer (eod)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE from the Parties Regarding Agreed-Upon Mediator by plaintiff Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 11/30/2023; dispositive motions due by 2/28/2024; settlement conference set for 7/2/2024 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; bench trial set for 8/26/2024 at 08:30 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; case management order to issue (Proceedings Not Digitally Recorded) (sjc)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting (Joint Status Report) (Secunda, Paul)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #19 motion to stay; all dates remain as scheduled; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to stay Discovery and all Case Management Deadlines pending Ruling on Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss #19 filed by Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 of Abigail M. Bartine by defendants Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Bartine, Abigail) Modified text on 6/28/2022 (eod)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to stay Discovery and all Case Management Deadlines pending Ruling on Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss by defendants Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.; (Ross, Nancy)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER: motion to dismiss due by 8/19/2022; response due by 9/16/2022; reply due by 10/7/2022; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WITHDRAWAL by defendants Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. of MOTION to dismiss #10 filed by Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Ross, Nancy)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by defendants Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. [Attorney Nancy G. Ross added to party Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.(pty:dft)] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Nancy)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Harvey Miller as to Pamela A. Barnes; Cheryl K. Beebe; Duane Farrington; Donna A. Harman; Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.; Mark W. Kowlzan; Robert C. Lyons; Thomas P.; Samuel M.; Robert P. Mundy; Roger B.; Thomas A. Souleles; Paul T. Stecko; Michelle Wojdyla waiver sent on 6/20/2022, answer due 8/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Beebe Waiver, #2 Farrington Waiver, #3 Harmon Waiver, #4 Investment Committee Waiver, #5 Kowlzan Waiver, #6 Lyons Waiver, #7 Maurer Waiver, #8 Mencoff Waiver, #9 Mundy Waiver, #10 Porter Waiver, #11 Souleles Waiver, #12 Stecko Waiver, #13 Wojdyla Waiver) (Secunda, Paul) Modified text on 6/23/2022 (eod)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Mark W Kowlzan, Cheryl K Beebe, Duane Farrington, Donna A Harman, Robert C Lyons, Thomas P Maurer, Samuel M Mencoff, Roger B Porter, Thomas A Souleles, Paul T Stecko, Michelle Wojdyla, Robert P Mundy, Pamela A Barnes filed by Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michelle N. Webster on behalf of defendants Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Webster, Michelle)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE rescheduling hearing: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/6/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (aks)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/6/2022 at 1:30 PM by video before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; status report due by 6/29/2022; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #10 filed by Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jed Glickstein, #2 Exhibit 1 - PCA Plan (2016), #3 Exhibit 2 - Annual Fee Disclosure Statement (2016), #4 Exhibit 3 - Annual Fee Disclosure Statement (2017), #5 Exhibit 4 - Annual Fee Disclosure Statement (2018), #6 Exhibit 5 - Annual Fee Disclosure Statement (2019), #7 Exhibit 6 - Annual Fee Disclosure Statement (2020), #8 Exhibit 7 - Annual Fee Disclosure Statement (2021), #9 Exhibit 8 - PCA Plan Form 5500 (2018), #10 Exhibit 9 - Alleged Comparator Plan Form 5500s (2018), #11 Exhibit 10 - Kimberly-Clark Plan Form 5500 (2018)) (Ross, Nancy)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss by defendants Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.; (Ross, Nancy)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Abigail Bartine on behalf of defendants Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Bartine, Abigail)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nancy G. Ross on behalf of defendants Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Ross, Nancy)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jed Wolf Glickstein on behalf of defendants Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (Glickstein, Jed)
April 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Harvey Miller as to Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 (Secunda, Paul)
April 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Harvey Miller as to Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 (Secunda, Paul) Modified text on 4/11/2022 (eod)
April 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Harvey Miller as to Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 (Secunda, Paul)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 motion for limited admission; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for limited admission Pro Hac Vice of James A. Walcheske by plaintiff Harvey Miller; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of J. Walcheske, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Haney, Troy)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., Packaging Corporation of America, Inc., The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. (eod)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (eod)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Haney, Troy)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Harvey Miller (Haney, Troy) Modified text on 3/24/2022 (eod)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Harvey Miller in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6701968 (Haney, Troy)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul M. Secunda on behalf of plaintiff Harvey Miller (Secunda, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Miller
Represented By: Paul M. Secunda
Represented By: Troy W. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd K Lamunyon
Represented By: Paul M. Secunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Jed Wolf Glickstein
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Jed Wolf Glickstein
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Administration Committee of The Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Jed Wolf Glickstein
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W. Kowlzan
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl K. Beebe
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Farrington
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna A. Harman
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Lyons
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Maurer
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel M. Mencoff
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger B. Porter
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Souleles
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Stecko
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investment Committee of the Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wojdyla
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Mundy
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Barnes
Represented By: Abigail Bartine
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Represented By: Elaine Liu
Represented By: Nancy G. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Robert A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?