Peck v. Munson Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Peck
Defendant: Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare and Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00294
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Filing 36 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 motion to stay; joint status report due 3/23/2023; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Munson Healthcare (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
December 16, 2022 Filing 33 JOINT MOTION to stay proceedings pending Mediation by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare; (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Defendant Munson Healthcare file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 14, 2022 Filing 31 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 with affirmative defenses by Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER approving STIPULATION #29 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 10, 2022 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 27, 2022 Filing 27 SURREPLY TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #13 filed by Samuel D. Peck (ns)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 motion for leave to file ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 14, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE : Plaintiff''s Notice of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff Samuel D. Peck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Coyer Decision) (Secunda, Paul) Modified text on 10/17/2022 (slk).
October 14, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE re #13 Munson's Notice of Supplemental Authority by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
September 14, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Surreply In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #21 filed by Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 motion to withdraw as attorney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 12, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to file Surreply In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by plaintiff Samuel D. Peck; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Surreply) (Secunda, Paul)
September 12, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to withdraw as attorney Alexandra Belzley by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare; (Blumenfeld, Jeremy) Modified text on 9/13/2022 (slk).
September 12, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to response to motion #13 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
August 23, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re Response in Opposition #17 by plaintiff Samuel D. Peck (Secunda, Paul) Modified text on 8/24/2022 (slk).
August 23, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #13 filed by Samuel D. Peck (Secunda, Paul)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving STIPULATION #15 ; deadline to file response extended to 8/24/2022; deadline to file reply extended to 9/14/2022; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by plaintiff Samuel D. Peck (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Secunda, Paul)
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #13 filed by Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare; (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving STIPULATION #11 ; deadline for defendants to file responsive pleading extended to 7/19/2022; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's amended complaint by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy) Modified text on 6/24/2022 (ns).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing as moot #7 motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare filed by Samuel D. Peck (Secunda, Paul)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim FRCP 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare; (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
May 26, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexandra Belzley on behalf of defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Belzley, Alexandra)
May 26, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Samuel Block on behalf of defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Block, Samuel)
May 9, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sari M. Alamuddin on behalf of defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Alamuddin, Sari)
May 9, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeremy P. Blumenfeld on behalf of defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Samuel D. Peck as to The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare waiver sent on 3/31/2022, answer due 5/31/2022 (Secunda, Paul)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Samuel D. Peck as to Munson Healthcare waiver sent on 3/31/2022, answer due 5/31/2022 (Secunda, Paul)
March 30, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Munson Healthcare, The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare (slk)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Haney, Troy)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Claims Under 29 U.S.C. 1132(a)(2) against All Defendants filed by Samuel D. Peck (Haney, Troy)
March 29, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Samuel D. Peck in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6706923 (Haney, Troy)
March 29, 2022 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (not provided at the time of filing) (slk)
March 29, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul M. Secunda on behalf of plaintiff Samuel D. Peck (Secunda, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peck v. Munson Healthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Peck
Represented By: Paul M. Secunda
Represented By: Troy W. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munson Healthcare
Represented By: Alexandra Belzley
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Samuel Block
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of Munson Healthcare
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Alexandra Belzley
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Samuel Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?