Mims #838715 et al v. Simon et al
Plaintiff: Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129
Defendant: P.C. Simon, Unknown Cook, Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Ybara and Unknown Leuther
Case Number: 1:2022cv00323
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Walker in the amount of $8.61, receipt number GR077023; amount paid to date by Walker $8.61; amount paid to date in case $8.61 (jmw)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER from plaintiff Estes Walker #932129 to Judge Maloney regarding retaliation for filing lawsuit (pjw) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (pjw).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: within 14 days, plaintiffs shall file a copy of this order and sufficient additional copies of the complaint for service upon defendants; upon receipt of the copies, the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Regarding Service - Prisoner #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 with copy of compliant (pjw)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #15 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (kmd).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Removing Case from Early Mediation #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATEMENT from plaintiffs Doyle Mims #838715, Estes Walker #932129 seeking exclusion from the prisoner civil rights litigation early mediation program; docket sheet also mailed as requested (pjw) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (pjw).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by May 23, 2022; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Order #13 , Opinion (Screening) #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Doyle Mims #838715 (klb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Order #13 , Opinion (Screening) #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 (klb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129 (jmw)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 and partially dismissing; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint by plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (pjw)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Estes Walker #932129 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff Mims to pay an initial partial fee of $3.82 when funds are available; plaintiff Walker to pay an initial partial fee of $8.61 when funds are available; plaintiffs to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129 (jmw)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF by plaintiffs Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129 in support of Complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (pjw) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/25/2022 (pjw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2022: #1 Signatue page for plaintiff Walker) (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from plaintiffs Doyle Mims #838715, Estes Walker #932129 requesting docket sheet; court docket sheet mailed on 4/4/2022 (pjw)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit by plaintiff Walker (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw) Modified text on 4/4/2022 (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit by plaintiff Mims (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw) Modified text on 4/4/2022 (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Estes Walker #932129, Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mims #838715 et al v. Simon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyle Mims #838715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estes Walker #932129
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ybara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Leuther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?