Carson #672758 v. Fengley
Plaintiff: Taranda Carson #672758
Defendant: Unknown Fengley
Case Number: 1:2022cv00650
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Unknown Fengley re Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Lane, Alicia)
August 22, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alicia Lane on behalf of defendant Unknown Fengley for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Lane, Alicia)
August 2, 2022 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Taranda Carson #672758 (ns)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by August 22, 2022; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Taranda Carson #672758 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)
July 20, 2022 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Taranda Carson #672758 (ns)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $3.03 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/9/2022 (ns)
July 19, 2022 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Taranda Carson #672758 (ns)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ns)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Unknown Fengley filed by Taranda Carson #672758 (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson #672758 v. Fengley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taranda Carson #672758
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fengley
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?