Burton v. R.G. Peters Salt and Lumber Company et al
Plaintiff: Emma Burton
Defendant: R.G. Peters Salt and Lumber Company and Richard G. Peters
Petitioner: Fifth Third Bank
Interested Party: Wheeler Upham, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00772
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss #35 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 30, 2022 Filing 35 STIPULATION of dismissal by movant Fifth Third Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal) (Bruinsma, James) Modified text on 10/3/2022 (ems).
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER dismissing #1 motion for relief from an order of this Court; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) Modified text on 8/26/2022 (ems).
August 24, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from miscellaneous case 1:21-mc-81, to the civil case docket; all future filings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER of 1:22-cv-772 (jlg)
August 23, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings pursuant to Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge #31 ; Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou no longer assigned to case (eod)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT of all parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge and ORDER OF REFERENCE; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
August 19, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of consent by movant Fifth Third Bank (Bruinsma, James) Modified text on 8/22/2022 (eod)
August 18, 2022 Filing 29 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of telephone status conference (Proceedings NOT Recorded) (ald)
August 17, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of status conference set for 8/18/2022 at 01:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
August 17, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of settlement conference; case settled; notice of telephone conference to issue. (Portions Digitally Recorded) (ald)
July 11, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE rescheduling hearing: settlement conference set for 8/17/2022 at 09:30 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER regarding settlement conference: settlement conference set for 7/14/2022 at 09:30 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #1 ; deadline for filing response extended to 7/28/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
June 14, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of status conference; order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald)
June 13, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by movant Fifth Third Bank re Order on Motion for Service by Publication #21 , MOTION for service by publication #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bruinsma, James)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 motion for service by publication; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for service by publication #18 filed by Fifth Third Bank (Bruinsma, James)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding Motion for Service by Publication #18 and certificate of concurrence; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
April 8, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for service by publication by movant Fifth Third Bank; (Bruinsma, James)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting STIPULATION #16 ; Status conference is RESCHEDULED to 6/14/2022 at 10:00 am; response to motion due 7/5/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
April 6, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Adjourn Status Conference by movant Fifth Third Bank (Bruinsma, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE that this case is now referred to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou after Order of Recusal #14 ; case is no longer referred to District Judge Jonker (eod)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING CASE and SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of status conference; order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE that this case was randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker on December 7, 2021, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.3.1(e) (jlg) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (jlg)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Status Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, 499 Federal Building 110 Michigan Street NW Grand Rapids, Michigan; responsive deadline is stayed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Green ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Stay Response Deadline by movant Fifth Third Bank (Bruinsma, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT with Final Order of 1723 from National Archives (eod) Modified text on 11/29/2021 (eod)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Bill of Complaint from National Archives (eod)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 DOCKET SHEET from underlying case, 1723, received from National Archives (eod) Modified text on 11/29/2021 (eod)
November 12, 2021 MOTION to stay (as taken from #4 ) by interested party Wheeler Upham, P.C.; (eod)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Status Conference and Stay Time for Response Related to Motion and Brief Filed by Fifth Third Bank under FRCivP 60(b)(5) and (6) for Relief from Order of this Court by interested party Wheeler Upham, P.C. (TerBeek, Michael) Modified text on 11/15/2021 (eod)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by movant Fifth Third Bank re MOTION for relief from from order of this court #1 Supplemental (Bruinsma, James)
November 12, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael James TerBeek on behalf of interested party Wheeler Upham, P.C. ; party Wheeler Upham, P.C. added (TerBeek, Michael)
November 12, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Glenn L. Smith on behalf of interested party Wheeler Upham, P.C. (Smith, Glenn)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for relief from order of this court by movant Fifth Third Bank; (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H) (eod) Modified text on 8/26/2022 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. R.G. Peters Salt and Lumber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.G. Peters Salt and Lumber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: James Robert Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wheeler Upham, P.C.
Represented By: Glenn L. Smith
Represented By: Michael James TerBeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?