Walker #932129 et al v. Simon et al
Plaintiff: Estes Walker #932129
Defendant: P.C. Simon, Unknown Cook, Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Ybara and Unknown Leuther
Case Number: 1:2022cv00848
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $16.00, receipt number 100000518; amount paid to date $24.61 (klb)
October 18, 2022 Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Defendants' motion for summary judgment #28 be granted, that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants be dismissed withoutprejudice, and that this matter be closed; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
October 18, 2022 Copy of Report and Recommendation, #33 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker (mlc)
September 14, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SEVERED CASE (pjw)
September 14, 2022 Copy of Notice (Other) #32 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 (jmw)
September 14, 2022 Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #31 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #23 ; denying motion for preliminary injunction #21 ; severing claims of plaintiffs into two separate cases; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 1, 2022 Filing 30 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Estes Walker #932129 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (jrg)
August 24, 2022 Filing 29 BRIEF in support of MOTION for summary judgment on the basis of exhaustion with motion concurrence statement and a certificate of service #28 with word count concurrence and a Certificate of Service filed by Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Cook, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, P.C. Simon, Unknown Ybara (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1: MDOC Policy Directive (P.D.) 03.02.130, "Prisoner/Parolee Grievances" (eff. date Mar. 13, 2019), #3 Exhibit 2: Mims' Step III Grievance Report, #4 Exhibit 3: Walker's Step III Grievance Report) (Ho, Joseph)
August 24, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for summary judgment on the basis of exhaustion with motion concurrence statement and a certificate of service with certificate of service by defendants Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Cook, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, P.C. Simon, Unknown Ybara; (Ho, Joseph) Modified text on 8/25/2022 (pjw).
August 16, 2022 Copy of Case Management Order #26 and Notice Regarding Consent #27 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
August 15, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE regarding consent; statement regarding consent due 9/6/2022 (jal)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; discovery to be completed by 12/13/2022; dispositive motions due by 1/10/2023; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
August 15, 2022 Filing 25 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendants Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Cook, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, P.C. Simon, Unknown Ybara (Ho, Joseph)
August 15, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Cook, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, P.C. Simon, Unknown Ybara re Attorney Appearance (Ho, Joseph)
August 15, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Ho on behalf of defendants Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Cook, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, P.C. Simon, Unknown Ybara (Ho, Joseph)
August 8, 2022 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court deny Plaintiff Mims's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #21 , and that the Court sever Plaintiff Walker's claims into a separate action; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
August 8, 2022 Copy of Report and Recommendation #23 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
August 2, 2022 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Mims in the amount of $10.00, receipt number GR077460; amount paid to date by Mims $13.82; amount paid to date in case $26.25 (klb)
July 11, 2022 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Unknown Bledsoe waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Unknown Cook waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Unknown Floyd waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Unknown Morgan waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Unknown Scott waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; P.C. Simon waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Unknown Ybara waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (pjw)
July 11, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for order to grant temporary communication via I.D. institutional mail by plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715; (pjw)
July 11, 2022 Filing 20 LETTER from plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715 requesting docket sheet; docket sheet mailed to plaintiff 7/11/22 (ems)
July 6, 2022 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $3.82, receipt number GR077295; amount paid to date $12.43 (amount paid to date by Plaintiff Mims: $3.82) (slk)
June 13, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER from plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715 requesting docket sheet; docket sheet mailed to plaintiff 6/13/22 (ems)
June 7, 2022 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendants Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Cook, Unknown Floyd, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Scott, P.C. Simon, Unknown Ybara (ns)
June 7, 2022 COPIES FOR SERVICE received re Order #17 (ns)
June 1, 2022 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Walker in the amount of $8.61, receipt number GR077023; amount paid to date by Walker $8.61; amount paid to date in case $8.61 (jmw)
May 26, 2022 Filing 18 LETTER from plaintiff Estes Walker #932129 to Judge Maloney regarding retaliation for filing lawsuit (pjw) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (pjw).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: within 14 days, plaintiffs shall file a copy of this order and sufficient additional copies of the complaint for service upon defendants; upon receipt of the copies, the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
May 23, 2022 Copy of Order Regarding Service - Prisoner #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 with copy of compliant (pjw)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #15 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (kmd).
May 20, 2022 Copy of Order Removing Case from Early Mediation #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
May 19, 2022 Filing 15 STATEMENT from plaintiffs Doyle Mims #838715, Estes Walker #932129 seeking exclusion from the prisoner civil rights litigation early mediation program; docket sheet also mailed as requested (pjw) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (pjw).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by May 23, 2022; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
May 2, 2022 Certified Copy of Order #13 , Opinion (Screening) #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Doyle Mims #838715 (klb)
May 2, 2022 Certified Copy of Order #13 , Opinion (Screening) #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 (klb)
May 2, 2022 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129 (jmw)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 and partially dismissing; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 29, 2022 Filing 12 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint by plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (pjw)
April 14, 2022 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Estes Walker #932129 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Doyle Mims #838715 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff Mims to pay an initial partial fee of $3.82 when funds are available; plaintiff Walker to pay an initial partial fee of $8.61 when funds are available; plaintiffs to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
April 13, 2022 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129 (jmw)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF by plaintiffs Doyle Mims #838715 and Estes Walker #932129 in support of Complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (pjw) Modified text on 4/6/2022 (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/25/2022 (pjw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2022: #1 Signatue page for plaintiff Walker) (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from plaintiffs Doyle Mims #838715, Estes Walker #932129 requesting docket sheet; court docket sheet mailed on 4/4/2022 (pjw)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit by plaintiff Walker (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw) Modified text on 4/4/2022 (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit by plaintiff Mims (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw) Modified text on 4/4/2022 (pjw).
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Estes Walker #932129, Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)
April 4, 2022 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Estes Walker #932129 and Doyle Mims #838715 (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker #932129 et al v. Simon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estes Walker #932129
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C. Simon
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cook
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bledsoe
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morgan
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scott
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Floyd
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ybara
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Leuther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?