In Re Hope College Data Security Breach Litigation
Plaintiff: Jenny Devries and Jennie Devries
Defendant: Hope College
Case Number: 1:2022cv01224
Filed: December 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Phillip J Green
2 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 motion to consolidate cases; amended complaint to be filed within 30 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases and Set a Schedule for the Filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint #8 filed by Jennie Devries (Miller, E.)
February 9, 2023 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases and Set a Schedule for the Filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint #8 filed by Jennie Devries (Miller, E.)
February 9, 2023 Filing 8 JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases and Set a Schedule for the Filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint by plaintiff Jennie Devries; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Miller, E.)
January 11, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jennie Devries as to Hope College waiver sent on 1/9/2023, answer due 3/10/2023 (Hughes, Emily)
January 10, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Benjamin F. Johns on behalf of plaintiff Jennie Devries (Johns, Benjamin)
January 10, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan Shub on behalf of plaintiff Jennie Devries (Shub, Jonathan)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney for all further proceedings pursuant to Order #5 by Judge Jane M. Beckering ; Judge Jane M. Beckering no longer assigned to the case (slk)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: District Judge Jane M. Beckering recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Hope College (slk)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (slk)
December 26, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Miller, E.)
December 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hope College filed by Jenny Devries (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Hope College Press Release (Dec. 15, 2022), Notice of Data Security Event, #3 Exhibit B- Office of the Maine Attorney General (Dec. 2022), Data Breach Notifications, #4 Exhibit C- Hope College Webpage, About section (as of Dec. 26, 2022), #5 Exhibit D- Marc van Lieshout, The Value of Personal Data, 457 IFIP Advances in Information and Communication Technology 26 (May 10, 2015), #6 Exhibit E- Exploring the Economics of Personal Data: A Survey of Methodologies for Measuring Monetary Value, OECD Digital Economic Papers No. 220 (Apr. 2, 2013), #7 Exhibit F- U.S. Firms to Spend Nearly $19.2 Billion on Third-Party Audience Data and Data-Use Solutions in 2018, Up 17.5% from 2017, Interactive Advertising Bureau (Dec. 5, 2018), #8 Exhibit G- Anita George, Your personal data is for sale on the dark web. Here's how much it costs, Digital Trends (Oct. 16, 2019), #9 Exhibit H- Brian Stack, Here's How Much Your Personal Information Is Selling for on the Dark Web, Experian (Dec. 6, 2017), #10 Exhibit I- In the Dark, VPNOverview.com, 2019, #11 Exhibit J- Janice Y. Tsai, et al., The Effect of Online Privacy Information on Purchasing Behavior, An Experimental Study, 22(2) Information Systems Research 254 (June 2011), #12 Exhibit K- Ben Kochman, FBI, Secret Service Warn of Targeted Ransomware, Law360 (Nov. 18, 2019)) (Miller, E.)
December 26, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of plaintiff Jenny Devries (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 26, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jenny Devries in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6934732 (Miller, E.)
December 26, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily Hughes on behalf of plaintiff Jenny Devries (Hughes, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Hope College Data Security Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Devries
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Devries
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?