Taft et al v. Lansing, City of et al
Plaintiff: DeMarco Taft and Carmela Taft
Defendant: Capital City Labor Program Inc., City of Lansing, Fraternal Order of Police, James Zolnai, Jeff Kurtz, Sam Kandel, Ryan Lawrence, Dan Salinez, Cory Campbell, Lansing, City of, Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. and Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Case Number: 1:2023cv00001
Filed: January 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO MOTION for summary judgment #18 Request for Order Denying Movant's Motion filed by DeMarco Taft (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, CCLP Inc Website Language) (Beason, John)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/7/2023 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 3/31/2023; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
February 14, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to response to motion #6 motion to dismiss filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. (Miller, Steven)
February 13, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for summary judgment by defendant Capital City Labor Program Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Appearance of Counsel, #3 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest, #4 Certificate of Service) (Maise, John)
February 1, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Kathryn O'Boyle on behalf of defendant Lansing, City of (O'Boyle, Amanda)
February 1, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew D. Staples on behalf of defendant Lansing, City of (Staples, Matthew)
January 31, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss #6 filed by DeMarco Taft (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, City of Lansing Employee Records) (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting STIPULATION #15 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
January 30, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File Answer to Complaint by defendants Cory Campbell, Sam Kandel, Jeff Kurtz, Lansing, City of, Ryan Lawrence, Dan Salinez, James Zolnai (Battersby, Holly)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Capital City Labor Program Inc. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to Lansing, City of waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to Cory Campbell waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to Sam Kandel waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to Jeff Kurtz waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to Ryan Lawrence waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to Dan Salinez waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DeMarco Taft as to James Zolnai waiver sent on 1/24/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Beason, John)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss by defendant Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.; (Miller, Steven)
January 30, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Holly Stockton Battersby on behalf of defendants Cory Campbell, Sam Kandel, Jeff Kurtz, Lansing, City of, Ryan Lawrence, Dan Salinez, James Zolnai (Battersby, Holly)
January 27, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven Eric Miller on behalf of defendant Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. (Miller, Steven)
January 20, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Fraternal Order of Police, Inc. served on 1/9/2023, answer due 1/30/2023 (Beason, John)
January 19, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Jeff Kurtz served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023 (Beason, John)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cory Campbell, Capital City Labor Program Inc., City of Lansing, Fraternal Order of Police, Sam Kandel, Jeff Kurtz, Ryan Lawrence, Dan Salinez, James Zolnai (eod)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (eod)
January 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by DeMarco Taft (Attachments: #1 Administrative Process Documents Initial Disclosures, #2 Summons City of Lansing, #3 Summons CCLP Inc., #4 Summons FOP, #5 Summons James Zolnai, #6 Summons Jeff Kurtz, #7 Summons Sam Kandel, #8 Summons Ryan Lawrence, #9 Summons Dan Salinez, #10 Summons Cory Campbell) (Beason, John)
January 1, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff DeMarco Taft in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6939207 (Beason, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taft et al v. Lansing, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeMarco Taft
Represented By: John Robert Beason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmela Taft
Represented By: John Robert Beason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital City Labor Program Inc.
Represented By: John Alexander Maise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lansing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraternal Order of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Zolnai
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Kurtz
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Kandel
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lawrence
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Salinez
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Campbell
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing, City of
Represented By: Amanda Kathryn O'Boyle
Represented By: Holly Stockton Battersby
Represented By: Matthew D. Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Eric Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?