Nelson v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Candace Nelson
Defendant: I. Matthew Miller, First Housing Corporation named as First Housing Corp., Real Estate Management and Development Firm doing business as Capitol Commons Senior, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development and Michigan State Housing Development Authority
Case Number: 1:2023cv00027
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development re MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #19 , Brief in Support of a Motion #20 , Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count #21 (Mazzocco, Nicole)
February 17, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #20 filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Mazzocco, Nicole)
February 17, 2023 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #19 filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Mazzocco, Nicole)
February 17, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development; (Mazzocco, Nicole)
February 8, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal re #7 ; United States Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 1/20/2023, answer due 3/21/2023 (ns) Modified text on 2/9/2023 (ns).
February 3, 2023 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Candace Nelson (ems)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 1, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #15 with certificate of service filed by Michigan State Housing Development Authority (Barwick, Lisa) Modified text on 2/1/2023 (ems).
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and lack of jurisdiction #14 with certificate of service filed by Michigan State Housing Development Authority (Barwick, Lisa) Modified text on 2/1/2023 (ems).
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and lack of jurisdiction with certificate of service by defendant Michigan State Housing Development Authority; (Barwick, Lisa) Modified text on 2/1/2023 (ems).
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE to attorney I. Matthew Miller regarding recent filing #11 (ems)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Michigan State Housing Development Authority re Attorney Appearance (Barwick, Lisa)
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 FIRST MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , FIRST MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants First Housing Corporation, I. Matthew Miller; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Landlord-Tenant judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order denying motion to vacate, #3 Exhibit 3 - Circuit Court Opinion, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mich. COA Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - COA letter to Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's appellate brief, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order of Eviction, #8 Certificate of Word Count Compliance) (Miller, I.) Modified text on 1/26/2023 (ems).
January 26, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lisa Michelle Barwick on behalf of defendant Michigan State Housing Development Authority (Barwick, Lisa)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Michael Jones for Michigan State Housing Development Authority served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023 (ems)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by I. Matthew Miller served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023 (ems)
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by J. Colles for First Housing Corporation served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023 (ems) Modified text on 1/25/2023 (ems).
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 1/20/2023, answer due 3/21/2023 (ems)
January 17, 2023 Copy of Order on Motion for TRO #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Candace Nelson (jrg)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 motion for TRO ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Candace Nelson; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (jlg)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
January 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
January 9, 2023 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Candace Nelson (ems)
January 9, 2023 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Candace Nelson (ems)
January 9, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
January 9, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Housing Corporation, Michigan State Housing Development Authority, I. Matthew Miller and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit submitted by plaintiff Candace Nelson (ems)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against First Housing Corporation, Michigan State Housing Development Authority, I. Matthew Miller, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development filed by Candace Nelson (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Matthew Miller
Represented By: I. Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Housing Corporation named as First Housing Corp., Real Estate Management and Development Firm doing business as Capitol Commons Senior
Represented By: I. Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State Housing Development Authority
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Barwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?