Goodwin v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Shirley Goodwin
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2023cv00482
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thomas R. Behm; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 7/14/2023 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 7/14/2023 (kmd)
July 6, 2023 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Walmart Inc. for Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production (Heidenreich, Julian)
July 6, 2023 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Walmart Inc. for Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Heidenreich, Julian)
July 5, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Selection of Mediator by defendant Walmart Inc. (Heidenreich, Julian) Modified text on 7/5/2023 (ems).
June 23, 2023 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Shirley Goodwin for Initial Disclosures (Schlinker, Loryn)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: not recorded) (rmw)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting proposed stipulated protective order #14 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
June 21, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1) by plaintiff Shirley Goodwin (Schlinker, Loryn) Modified text on 6/21/2023 (ems).
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice to refile proposed stipulated protective order #12 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
June 19, 2023 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1) by plaintiff Shirley Goodwin (Schlinker, Loryn) Modified text on 6/20/2023 (ems).
June 12, 2023 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Schlinker, Loryn)
June 2, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Julian Heidenreich on behalf of defendant Walmart Inc. (Heidenreich, Julian)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/22/2023 at 02:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 6/15/2023; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Shirley Goodwin re #8 (Schlinker, Loryn) Modified text on 5/25/2023 (ems).
May 25, 2023 Filing 8 CORRECTED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. (Wright, Nicole) Modified text on 5/25/2023 (ems).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking answer #6 ; Defendant shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
May 23, 2023 Filing 6 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint #1 with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. (Wright, Nicole) Modified text per Order #7 on 5/23/2023 (ems).
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (Wright, Nicole)
May 17, 2023 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Shirley Goodwin for Request to Produce (Schlinker, Loryn)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Defendant file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
May 17, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Loryn E. Schlinker on behalf of plaintiff Shirley Goodwin (Schlinker, Loryn)
May 11, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Receipt was filed in error and should be disregarded (mlc)
May 10, 2023 (DISREGARD) RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number AMIWDC-7054250; for Civil Case Filing Fee (mlc) Modified text on 5/11/2023; entered in wrong case (mlc).
May 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalamazoo County Circuit Court case number 23-0177-NO filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit C - Letter and proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages) (Wright, Nicole) Modified text on 5/10/2023 (ems).
May 9, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Walmart Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7053875 (Wright, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Goodwin
Represented By: Loryn E. Schlinker
Represented By: Paul Edward Shibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Wright
Represented By: Julian Heidenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Thomas R. Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?