Lawson #287931 v. Davids et al
Plaintiff: Garfield Lawson #287931
Defendant: John Davids, Hunter Doesberg, Bath DeBoer, Unknown Mitchell, Paul Perry, S. Morris, Unknown Kinney, Unknown Yuhas, Unknown Wood, Unknown Sandborn, Unknown Mahalic, Sabrina Davis, Unknown Cassel, Unknown Barber, Unknown Bennett, Timothy Moore, Unknown Hawn, Brooke Oversmith, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Norton and Beth DeBoer
Case Number: 1:2023cv00776
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Barber, Unknown Bennett, Unknown Cassel, John Davids, Sabrina Davis, Beth DeBoer, Hunter Doesberg, Unknown Hawn, Unknown Kinney, Unknown Mahalic, Unknown Mitchell, Timothy Moore, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Norton, Brooke Oversmith, Paul Perry, Unknown Sandborn, Paul Woodward, Unknown Yuhas re Notice (Other) #12 Amended and Corrected Limited Appearance (Lane, Alicia)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED and Corrected Limited Appearance of Counsel by defendant Paul Woodward (Lane, Alicia) (Note: defendant Paul Woodward removed as a party; incorrectly added from this document) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (pjw)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Specify and Correct submitted by Garfield Lawson #287931; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (fhw)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #11 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Garfield Lawson #287931 (eod) Modified text on 9/12/2023 (eod)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Barber, Unknown Bennett, Unknown Cassel, John Davids, Sabrina Davis, Beth DeBoer, Hunter Doesberg, Unknown Hawn, Unknown Kinney, Unknown Mahalic, Unknown Mitchell, Timothy Moore, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Norton, Brooke Oversmith, Paul Perry, Unknown Sandborn, Unknown Wood, Unknown Yuhas re Attorney Appearance (Limited), (Lane, Alicia)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alicia Lane on behalf of defendants Unknown Barber, Unknown Bennett, Unknown Cassel, John Davids, Sabrina Davis, Beth DeBoer, Hunter Doesberg, Unknown Hawn, Unknown Kinney, Unknown Mahalic, Unknown Mitchell, Timothy Moore, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Norton, Brooke Oversmith, Paul Perry, Unknown Sandborn, Unknown Wood, Unknown Yuhas for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Lane, Alicia)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; IFP is granted; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by September 6, 2023; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Garfield Lawson #287931 (jlg)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Garfield Lawson #287931 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (jjm)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Garfield Lawson #287931 re Affidavit #5 , Verification Statement #6 (eod)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VERIFICATION STATEMENT re #1 by plaintiff Garfield Lawson #287931 (eod)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #1 by plaintiff Garfield Lawson #287931 (eod)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/14/2023 (jjm)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Garfield Lawson #287931 (jjm)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Garfield Lawson #287931 re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 , complaint, #1 (jjm)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (jjm)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Garfield Lawson #287931 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Summons) (jjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson #287931 v. Davids et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garfield Lawson #287931
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davids
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Doesberg
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath DeBoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mitchell
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Perry
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kinney
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Yuhas
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wood
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sandborn
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mahalic
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Davis
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cassel
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barber
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bennett
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Moore
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hawn
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Oversmith
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morgan
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Norton
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth DeBoer
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?