Causey #108113 v. Ouellette et al
Plaintiff: Charles Causey #108113
Defendant: Margaret Ouellette, Suzanne Groff and Unknown Party #1
Case Number: 1:2023cv00884
Filed: August 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER lifting stay and for service; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for partial dismissal; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (DISREGARD) ORDER for partial dismissal ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) Modified text on 10/18/2023 - document did not attach (slk).
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendants Suzanne Groff, Margaret Ouellette (slk)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Opinion (Screening) #10 , Order #13 , Order #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Causey (slk)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Removing Case from Early Mediation #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Causey (slk)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION re #8 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT from defendants Suzanne Groff, Margaret Ouellette seeking exclusion from the prisoner civil rights litigation early mediation program (Pillow, Nicholas)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nicholas Pillow on behalf of defendants Suzanne Groff, Margaret Ouellette for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program with proof of service (Pillow, Nicholas) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (slk).
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings (slk)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Causey (slk)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Charles Causey #108113 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (slk)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; IFP is granted; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by 9/19/2023; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Causey (slk)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 9/15/2023 (slk)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Causey (slk)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Causey (slk)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Charles Causey #108113; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles Causey #108113 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Causey #108113 v. Ouellette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Causey #108113
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Ouellette
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Groff
Represented By: Nicholas Pillow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?