Burnett #200640 v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Burnett #200640
Defendant: Heidi Washington, Grand Prairie Wellpath, Margaret Ouellette, Suzanne Groff, Brenda Buchanan, Lori Blue and Emily Cecil
Case Number: 1:2023cv00896
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff has not sufficiently shown cause; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Dismissing Case #12 , Judgment Dismissing Case #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (eod)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE TO #7 Order to Show Cause filed by plaintiff Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (pjw) Modified text on 9/29/2023 (pjw)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (ns)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Plaintiff's "Motion for Enlargement of Time to File ResponseShowing Cause Why Plaintiff Should be Allowed to Proceed" in forma pauperis despite having three strikes; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time to file response to Order to Show Cause #7 by plaintiff Michael Angelo Burnett #200640; (eod)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (eod)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Setting Misc. Deadline - Prisoner #7 , Opinion #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (jrg)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff to show cause or filing fee to be submitted by 9/27/2023; failure to comply will result in denial of leave to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissal of case without prejudice; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (jrg)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (jrg)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 9/15/2023 (jrg)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for order to proceed under the imminent danger of serious physical injury exception by plaintiff Michael Angelo Burnett #200640; (jrg)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (DISREGARD) NOTICE of receipt of case (jrg) Modified text on 8/28/2023 (jrg)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (jrg)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lori Blue, Brenda Buchanan, Emily Cecil, Grand Prairie Wellpath, Suzanne Groff, Margaret Ouellette, Heidi Washington filed by Michael Angelo Burnett #200640 (jrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett #200640 v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Burnett #200640
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Prairie Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Ouellette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?