Figel #179188 et al v. McNees, et al
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Figel #179188
Defendant: Logan McNees, Unknown Kaliszewski, Unknown Franz, Kevin Newland, R. Wood, K. Betcke, Unknown Keough, G. Lafler, Unknown Pattison, Unknown Sikkema, Unknown Jones, Trent Hengesbach, Unknown Sandborn, B. Oversmith, Unknown Bledsoe, Unknown Morgan, Unknown Kerr, Unknown Bennett, R. Henry, Unknown Salinas, Unknown Cassel, J. Dunigan, Dale Bonn and John Davids
Case Number: 1:2023cv01039
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #19 , Order Rejecting Pleading #18 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory A. Figel #179188 (jmw)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REJECTING Miscellaneous Documents submitted by Gregory A. Figel #179188; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REJECTING Miscellaneous Documents submitted by Gregory A. Figel #179188; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for order regarding prisoner early mediation by plaintiff Gregory A. Figel #179188; (mg)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Bennett, K. Betcke, Unknown Bledsoe, Dale Bonn, Unknown Cassel, John Davids, J. Dunigan, Unknown Franz, Trent Hengesbach, R. Henry, Unknown Jones, Unknown Kaliszewski, Unknown Keough, Unknown Kerr, G. Lafler, Logan McNees, Unknown Morgan, Kevin Newland, B. Oversmith, Unknown Pattison, Unknown Salinas, Unknown Sandborn, Unknown Sikkema, R. Wood re Attorney Appearance (Limited),, (Raines, Austin)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Austin Curtis Raines on behalf of defendants Unknown Bennett, K. Betcke, Unknown Bledsoe, Dale Bonn, Unknown Cassel, John Davids, J. Dunigan, Unknown Franz, Trent Hengesbach, R. Henry, Unknown Jones, Unknown Kaliszewski, Unknown Keough, Unknown Kerr, G. Lafler, Logan McNees, Unknown Morgan, Kevin Newland, B. Oversmith, Unknown Pattison, Unknown Salinas, Unknown Sandborn, Unknown Sikkema, R. Wood for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Raines, Austin)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (DISREGARD) ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Syed M. Abedi; attorney admission deadline set for 12/13/2023; (mg) Modified text on 11/15/2023; entered in wrong case (mg).
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER from Court re #13 (Financial Administrator, ced)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER from Gregory A. Figel #179188 regarding filing fees and #11 . (ns)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by November 30, 2023; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory A. Figel #179188 (mg)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER from Gregory Allan Figel #179188 regarding filing fees (dated 11/2/2023) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (mg) Modified text on 11/15/2023 (mg).
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER from Gregory Allan Figel #179188 regarding filing fees/financial matters (mg) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (mg). Modified text on 11/15/2023 (mg).
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $402.00, receipt number 100003210; amount paid to date $552.00 (klb)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #6 , Opinion #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory A. Figel #179188 (mlc)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff Gregory A. Figel #179188 regarding filing fees (slk)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $150.00, receipt number 100003100; amount paid to date $150.00 (jmw)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Gregory A. Figel #179188 re Notice (Other) #7 (mlc)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE re #1 named as, "plaintiff's notification of inadvertent error" (mlc)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $402.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory A. Figel #179188 (mg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Gregory A. Figel #179188 re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 , complaint,,,, #1 (mg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Financial Documents) (mg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Unknown Bennett, K. Betcke, Unknown Bledsoe, Dale Bonn, Unknown Cassel, John Davids, J. Dunigan, Unknown Franz, Trent Hengesbach, R. Henry, Unknown Jones, Unknown Kaliszewski, Unknown Keough, Unknown Kerr, G. Lafler, Logan McNees, Unknown Morgan, Kevin Newland, B. Oversmith, Unknown Pattison, Unknown Salinas, Unknown Sandborn, Unknown Sikkema, R. Wood filed by Gregory A. Figel #179188 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36) (mg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from #1 ) by plaintiff Gregory A. Figel #179188 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figel #179188 et al v. McNees, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Figel #179188
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan McNees
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kaliszewski
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Franz
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Newland
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Wood
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Betcke
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Keough
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Lafler
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pattison
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sikkema
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Hengesbach
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sandborn
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Oversmith
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bledsoe
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morgan
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kerr
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bennett
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Henry
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Salinas
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cassel
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dunigan
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Bonn
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davids
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?