Edwards v. Restored Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adam Edwards
Defendant: Restored Holding, LLC, Credit-R-Us, Inc., Regan Higgs, Restored Holdings, LLC and West Michigan Court Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01042
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by defendant Restored Holdings, LLC re Corporate Disclosure Statement #31 (Van Eck, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Restored Holdings, LLC (Van Eck, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West Michigan Court Services, LLC (Stuart, Todd) Modified text on 11/28/2023 (ems).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Defendants Restored Holdings, LLC and West Michigan Court Services, LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant West Michigan Court Services, LLC re Corrected Memorandum in Support of a Motion #24 , Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint FRCP 12(b)(6) In Lieu of an Answer #21 (Stuart, Todd) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (ems).
November 22, 2023 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Restored Holdings, LLC re Answer to First Amended Complaint #19 , Corrected Affirmative Defenses #25 , Affirmative Defenses #20 , and Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Van Eck, William) Modified text on 11/22/2023; duplicate of #26 (ems).
November 22, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Restored Holdings, LLC re Answer to First Amended Complaint #19 , Corrected Affirmative Defenses #25 , Affirmative Defenses #20 , and Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Van Eck, William) Modified text on 11/22/2023 (ems)
November 22, 2023 Filing 25 CORRECTED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by defendant Restored Holdings, LLC re #19 by Restored Holdings, LLC (Van Eck, William) Modified text on 11/22/2023; this entry replaces #20 (ems).
November 22, 2023 Filing 24 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #21 Plaintiff's Complaint FRCP 12(b)(6) In Lieu of an Answer (corrected to comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1) filed by West Michigan Court Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stuart, Todd) Modified text on 11/22/2023; this entry replaces #22 (ems).
November 22, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE to attorney Todd Andrew Stuart regarding recent filing #22 (ems)
November 22, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #21 Plaintiff's Complaint FRCP 12(b)(6) In Lieu of an Answer filed by West Michigan Court Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stuart, Todd)
November 22, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint FRCP 12(b)(6) In Lieu of an Answer by defendant West Michigan Court Services, LLC; (Stuart, Todd)
November 22, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Todd Andrew Stuart on behalf of defendant West Michigan Court Services, LLC (Stuart, Todd)
November 21, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by defendant Restored Holdings, LLC re #19 by Restored Holdings, LLC (Van Eck, William) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (ems).
November 21, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint #10 by Restored Holdings, LLC (Van Eck, William) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (ems).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 pro se application for electronic filing and service; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER striking motion to dismiss #14 ; the Clerk of Court shall immediately serve a copy of this Order on Regan L. Higgs and Defendant West Michigan Court Services, LLC; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
November 15, 2023 Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 , Order on Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service #18 sent via U.S. Mail to Adam Edwards, West Michigan Court Services, LLC c/o Regan L. Higgs, and Regan L. Higgs (ems)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant West Michigan Court Services, LLC re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #14 , Affidavit in Support #15 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #14 filed by West Michigan Court Services, LLC (ems)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 (STRICKEN) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant West Michigan Court Services, LLC; (ems) Modified text per Order #17 on 11/15/2023 (ems).
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint upon Restored Holdings, LLC served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; West Michigan Court Services, LLC served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/27/2023 (ems)
October 13, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Restored Holdings, LLC, West Michigan Court Services, LLC and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Adam Edwards (ems)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO #9 providing service addresses for defendants filed by plaintiff Adam Edwards (ems)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Restored Holdings, LLC, West Michigan Court Services, LLC filed by Adam Edwards (ems)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff to provide service addresses for defendants within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jal)
October 5, 2023 Copy of Order #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Adam Edwards (ems)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) Modified text per Chambers on 10/4/2023 (ems).
October 4, 2023 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 , Order on Motion for TRO #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Adam Edwards (ems)
October 4, 2023 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Adam Edwards (ems)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying motion for TRO #2 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit submitted by plaintiff Adam Edwards (ems)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for TRO #2 filed by Adam Edwards (ems)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Adam Edwards; (ems)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit-R-Us, Inc., Regan Higgs, Restored Holding, LLC filed by Adam Edwards (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (ems)
October 3, 2023 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Adam Edwards (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Restored Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restored Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit-R-Us, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regan Higgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restored Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William Todd Van Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Michigan Court Services, LLC
Represented By: Todd Andrew Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?