Karen Keller International, Inc. v. EMO Advisors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Keller International, Inc.
Defendant: EMO Advisors, Inc. and Eric Olson
Case Number: 1:2023cv01044
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held November 14, 2023 before The Honorable Jane M. Beckering; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 2/20/2024 ; redaction request due 12/11/2023 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Hamlin, Genevieve, (517) 881-9582)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/4/2024 at 02:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 12/28/2023; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying motion for preliminary injunction #3 ; dissolving the Temporary Restraining Order #11 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
November 14, 2023 Filing 27 MINUTES of motion hearing re MOTION for preliminary injunction #3 held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: Genevieve Hamlin) (lep)
November 6, 2023 Filing 26 REPLY to response to motion #3 in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Keller International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Karen Keller) (Strauss, Rebecca)
November 2, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #20 and Affirmative Defenses by EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Pacific, Dean)
October 31, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction or in the alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order #3 filed by EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Supplemental Declaration of Eric Olson) (Pacific, Dean) Modified text on 11/1/2023 (slk).
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting STIPULATION #22 ; setting forth additional briefing schedule re request for preliminary injunction #3 ; 10/31/2023 hearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 at 2:30 p.m.; temporary restraining order #11 remains in effect; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
October 25, 2023 Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Re: Schedule for Proceedings on Plaintiff's Request for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 3) by defendants EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Pacific, Dean)
October 25, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael J. Bovill on behalf of defendants EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Bovill, Michael)
October 24, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to response to motion #13 , #5 , #3 in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Keller International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 20, 2023 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson filed by Karen Keller International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 19, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brandon S. Corcoran on behalf of plaintiff Karen Keller International, Inc. (Corcoran, Brandon)
October 17, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #18 filed by EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Pacific, Dean)
October 17, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction or in the alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order #3 filed by EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Pacific, Dean)
October 12, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE to attorney Rebecca L. Strauss regarding recent filing #15 , #16 (slk)
October 11, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed by Karen Keller International, Inc. as to Eric Olson, answer due 11/01/2023 (Strauss, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/12/2023 (slk).
October 11, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Karen Keller International, Inc. as to EMO Advisors, Inc. answer due 11/1/2023 (Strauss, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/12/2023 (slk).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting STIPULATION #13 ; modifying briefing schedule re request for preliminary injunction #3 ; 10/17/2023 hearing rescheduled to 10/31/2023 at 2:30 p.m.; temporary restraining order #11 remains in effect; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
October 10, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Schedule for Proceedings on Plaintiff's Request for a Preliminary Injunction #3 by defendants EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Pacific, Dean) Modified text on 10/11/2023 (slk).
October 10, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMO Advisors, Inc. (Pacific, Dean)
October 10, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dean F. Pacific on behalf of defendants EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (Pacific, Dean)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order #3 ; Defendants shall file a response to the request for preliminary injunction by close of business on October 10, 2023; setting a hearing for October 17, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Eric Olson (slk)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant EMO Advisors, Inc. (slk)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Karen Keller International, Inc. (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (slk)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Eric Olson re #1 (Strauss, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/3/2023 (slk).
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, or in the alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order by plaintiff Karen Keller International, Inc. (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 BRIEF in support of MOTION for preliminary injunction or in the alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order #3 filed by Karen Keller International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction or in the alternative, a Temporary Restraining Order by plaintiff Karen Keller International, Inc.; (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 for EMO Advisors, Inc. (Strauss, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/3/2023 (slk).
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Karen Keller International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 3, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Karen Keller International, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7179761 (Strauss, Rebecca)
October 3, 2023 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants EMO Advisors, Inc., Eric Olson (filing fee not paid) (slk)
October 3, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amber Kipfmiller on behalf of plaintiff Karen Keller International, Inc. (Kipfmiller, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Keller International, Inc. v. EMO Advisors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Keller International, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Kipfmiller
Represented By: Rebecca L. Strauss
Represented By: Brandon S. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMO Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Dean F. Pacific
Represented By: Michael J. Bovill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Olson
Represented By: Dean F. Pacific
Represented By: Michael J. Bovill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?