Greenridge Fruit, Inc. v. The Apple Truck, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greenridge Fruit, Inc.
Defendant: The Apple Truck, LLC, MariAnn Apley and Dale Apley
Case Number: 1:2023cv01052
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc. re Default (Entry of) #19 (O'Brien, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 19 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Dale Apley, MariAnn Apley (ems)
December 6, 2023 Filing 18 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendants Dale Apley and MariAnn Apley (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendants Dale Apley and MariAnn Apley) (O'Brien, Robert)
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendants Dale Apley and MariAnn Apley (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED due to insufficient affidavit) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Defendants Dale Apley and MariAnn Apley) (O'Brien, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2023 (ems).
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc. re Default and Judgment #15 (O'Brien, Robert)
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 DEFAULT and JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc. against defendant The Apple Truck, LLC (ems)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Default Judgment Against Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC by plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc. (O'Brien, Robert)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION for default judgment as to Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC #12 filed by Greenridge Fruit, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert W. O'Brien in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC) (O'Brien, Robert)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for default judgment as to Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC by plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc.; (O'Brien, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; MariAnn Apley served on 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023 (O'Brien, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Dale Apley served on 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023 (O'Brien, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc. re Default (Entry of) #8 (O'Brien, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant The Apple Truck, LLC (ems)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert W. O'Brien in Support of Request for Default Against Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC, #2 Proposed Document Default Against Defendant The Apple Truck, LLC) (O'Brien, Robert)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; The Apple Truck, LLC served on 10/9/2023, answer due 10/30/2023 (O'Brien, Robert)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Dale Apley, MariAnn Apley, The Apple Truck, LLC (mlc)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (mlc)
October 5, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greenridge Fruit, Inc. (O'Brien, Robert)
October 5, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (O'Brien, Robert)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dale Apley, MariAnn Apley, The Apple Truck, LLC filed by Greenridge Fruit, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (O'Brien, Robert)
October 5, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Greenridge Fruit, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7181291 (O'Brien, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenridge Fruit, Inc. v. The Apple Truck, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenridge Fruit, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Apple Truck, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MariAnn Apley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Apley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?