Baxter v. Arnold et al
Plaintiff: Cody Joseph Baxter
Defendant: Arnold Nelson Stuart, Grace Transport, Inc., Nelson Stuart Arnold and Progressive Michigan Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01078
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Nelson Stuart Arnold (mlc)
December 5, 2023 Filing 21 Corrected First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nelson Stuart Arnold and Grace Transport, Inc. filed by Cody Joseph Baxter (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 12/5/2023, this document replaces #20 (jlg)
December 5, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nelson Stuart Arnold filed by Cody Joseph Baxter (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (mlc)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 motion to file first amended complaint; directing Plaintiff to file their first amended complaint; directing clerk of court to amend case caption; expiration of summons remains 12/29/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
December 5, 2023 Filing 18 (DISREGARD) NOTICE to attorney Kujtim Sulolli regarding recent filing #17 (mlc) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (mlc)
December 5, 2023 Remark: Document #17 filed by attorney Kujtim Sulolli was filed correctly; Clerk's Notice #18 has been disregarded (mlc)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to amend/correct to file first amended complaint, amend case caption, and extend summons with brief in support and exhibits 1-3 by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter; (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (mlc)
November 15, 2023 Copy of Stipulation and Order #16 sent via U.S. Mail to barry J. Goodman (jjm)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER for Substitution of Plaintiff's Counsel; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
November 14, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for substitution of plaintiff's counsel by plaintiff Cody Joseph Baxter [Attorney Kujtim Sulolli added to party Cody Joseph Baxter(pty:pla)] (Sulolli, Kujtim) Modified text on 11/14/2023 (mlc)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Barry J. Goodman; attorney admission deadline set for 12/11/2023; (mkc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS by defendant Grace Transport, Inc.; (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/6/2023 (mlc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 12 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/6/2023 (mlc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/6/2023 (mlc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of filing Notice of Removal with State Court Documents by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 11/7/2023 (mlc)
November 6, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy S. Groustra on behalf of defendant Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. re Notice of Removal #1 to the Clerk of Court for Ionia County Circuit Court (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 10/27/2023 (mlc)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. re Notice of Removal #1 to Attorneys for Plaintiff (Groustra, Timothy) Modified text on 10/27/2023 (mlc)
October 23, 2023 Copy of Order #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Barry J. Goodman (mlc)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Removing Defendants to File Copies of all Records and Proceedings of the State court by 11/3/2023; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Barry J. Goodman; attorney admission deadline set for 11/8/2023; (mlc)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (mlc)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 (DISREGARD) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) Modified text on 10/11/2023 (mlc)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grace Transport, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ionia County Circuit Court case number 23-35942-NI filed by Grace Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, Dismissal Order; Progressive MI Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit C, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Groustra, Timothy) Modified on text 10/11/2023 (mlc)
October 11, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Grace Transport, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7185831 (Groustra, Timothy)
October 11, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Receipt of Case Notice #3 was filed in error and should be disregarded (mlc)
October 11, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Barry J. Goodman (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter v. Arnold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Joseph Baxter
Represented By: Barry J. Goodman
Represented By: Kujtim Sulolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Nelson Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Groustra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Stuart Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Michigan Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?