Acrisure LLC v. Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Acrisure LLC
Defendant: Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. and Daniel LaBroad
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2023cv01082
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Stephen A. Hilger; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 12/15/2023 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 12/15/2023 (kmd)
November 30, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Selection of Facilitative Mediator by plaintiff Acrisure LLC (Barnett, Michael)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 7/1/2024; dispositive motions due by 7/30/2024; settlement conference set for 2/4/2025 at 09:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 3/10/2025 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 4/1/2025 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE cancelling Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 11/21/2023 (jal)
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Acrisure LLC (Barnett, Michael)
November 13, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dallas Flick on behalf of defendants Daniel LaBroad, Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. (Flick, Dallas)
October 31, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Casey Lee Griffith on behalf of defendants Daniel LaBroad, Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. (Griffith, Casey)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call instructions for 11/21/2023 scheduling conference [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Acrisure LLC, Daniel LaBroad, Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. only] (jal)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/21/2023 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 11/15/2023; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
October 20, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acrisure LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acrisure Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent Acrisure Holdings, Inc. for Acrisure LLC (Barnett, Michael)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that plaintiff Acrisure LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Daniel LaBroad, Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. (Broxup, Daniel) Modified text on 10/19/2023 (ems).
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. (Broxup, Daniel)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel LaBroad (Broxup, Daniel)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 2023-08735-CBB filed by Daniel LaBroad, Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Complaint) (Broxup, Daniel) Modified text on 10/12/2023 (ems).
October 11, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Daniel LaBroad, Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7186215 (Broxup, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acrisure LLC v. Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acrisure LLC
Represented By: Michael Bradley Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovation Health & Life Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel John Broxup
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Dallas Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel LaBroad
Represented By: Daniel John Broxup
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Dallas Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Stephen A. Hilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?