Williams v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Rita Williams
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Dana Nessel, Frank G. Hillary, Chris Elsworth and Julie Nafkoor Pratt
Case Number: 1:2023cv01115
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
2 Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Julie Nafkoor Pratt re Response in Opposition, #17 (Vander Laan, Allan)
December 12, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction #15 filed by Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Julie Nafkoor Pratt (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Ryan Williams Plea Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Transcript of Ryan Williams Plea Hearing, #4 Exhibit C - Transcript of Ryan Williams Sentencing Hearing, #5 Exhibit D - ROS for Case No. 2023-23-2104-SM) (Vander Laan, Allan)
December 12, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mary Allison Waddell on behalf of defendants Dana Nessel, Gretchen Whitmer (Waddell, Mary)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE re #15 named as, "notice of presentment" (mlc)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order , MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiff Rita Williams; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (mlc) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (mlc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Julie Nafkoor Pratt re Answer to Complaint #13 (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Julie Nafkoor Pratt (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand with certificate of service thereon by Dana Nessel (Donnelly, Mark) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (mlc)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand with certificate of service thereon by Gretchen Whitmer (Donnelly, Mark) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (mlc)
November 9, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of defendants Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Julie Nafkoor Pratt (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 9, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kristen Lee Rewa on behalf of defendants Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Julie Nafkoor Pratt (Rewa, Kristen)
November 9, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark E. Donnelly on behalf of defendants Dana Nessel, Gretchen Whitmer (Donnelly, Mark)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint upon Chris Elsworth served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Frank G. Hillary served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Dana Nessel served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Julie Nafkoor Pratt served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023; Gretchen Whitmer served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023 (mlc)
October 26, 2023 Copy of Order on Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Rita Williams (mg)
October 26, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Elsworth, Frank G. Hillary, Dana Nessel, Julie Nafkoor Pratt, Gretchen Whitmer and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 pro se application for electronic filing and service; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
October 25, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent after Order of Recusal #7 ; case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (mg)
October 25, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Referral Judge After Recusal #8 , Order of Recusal #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Rita Williams (mg)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 24, 2023 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Rita Williams (pjw)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
October 23, 2023 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Rita Williams (mlc)
October 23, 2023 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Rita Williams (mlc)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Rita Williams (mlc)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Rita Williams; (mlc)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and claim for declaratory and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Rita Williams (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (mlc) Modified text on 10/23/2023 (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Mary Allison Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Mary Allison Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank G. Hillary
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Kristen Lee Rewa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Elsworth
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Kristen Lee Rewa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Nafkoor Pratt
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Kristen Lee Rewa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?