Linden v. St. Joseph, County of et al
Plaintiff: Howard Linden and Howard T. Linden
Defendant: COUNTY OF ST. JOSEPH, Sgt. Cody Back, Cpt. Kitty Buckner, Deputy Spencer Schrader, Deputy Paul Kindig, Deputy James Mohney, Deputy Tiffany Howe, Sgt. Jim Hasbrouck, Covered Bridge Healthcare of St. Joseph County, Inc., MD Bruce Hyde, LPN Regan Avery, THREE RIVERS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. d/b/a THREE RIVERS HEALTH, BEACON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. d/b/a THREE RIVERS HEALTH, KALAMAZOO EMERGENCY ASSOCIATES, PLC, RN Brandy Shoup, RN Andrea Barnard, RN Mary Michnick, MD Travis McClintock, Deputy Brian Chobot, St. Joseph, County of, Cody Back, Kitty Buckner, Spencer Schrader, Paul Kindig, Brian Chobot, James Mohney, Tiffany Howe, Jim Hasbrouck, Bruce Hyde, Regan R. Avery, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. jointly and severally doing business as Three Rivers Health, Beacon Health System, Inc. jointly and severally doing business as Three Rivers Health, Brandy Shoup, Andrea Barnard, Mary Michnick and Travis McClintock
Case Number: 1:2023cv01116
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 41 ANSWER to complaint, #1 by Regan R. Avery, Covered Bridge Healthcare of St. Joseph County, Inc. (Ellis, Patrick)
December 18, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Benham Ellis on behalf of defendants Regan R. Avery, Covered Bridge Healthcare of St. Joseph County, Inc. (Ellis, Patrick)
December 8, 2023 Filing 40 ANSWER to complaint, #1 by Cody Back, Kitty Buckner, Brian Chobot, Jim Hasbrouck, Tiffany Howe, Paul Kindig, James Mohney, Spencer Schrader, St. Joseph, County of (Brege, Andrew)
December 7, 2023 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. re Amended Answer to Complaint #38 with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand (Walker, Georgianne)
December 7, 2023 Filing 38 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #26 filed by defendants Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. with Jury Demand (Walker, Georgianne)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting STIPULATION #35 extending time for Defendants Three Rivers, Beacon and Shoup to file an Affidavit of Meritorious Defense; defendants' affidavits due 2/19/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
December 6, 2023 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. re STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to File an Affidavit of Meritorious Defense and Proposed Order by defendants Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. #35 (Walker, Georgianne)
December 6, 2023 Filing 35 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to File an Affidavit of Meritorious Defense and Proposed Order by defendants Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order A) (Walker, Georgianne)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER approving STIPULATION to dismiss claims against defendants Andrea Barnard (Griffin) and Mary Michnick #32 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
November 27, 2023 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Andrea Barnard, Beacon Health System, Inc., Mary Michnick, Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. re STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by defendants Andrea Barnard, Beacon Health System, Inc., Mary Michnick, Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. #32 (Walker, Georgianne) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (jjm).
November 27, 2023 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by defendants Andrea Barnard, Beacon Health System, Inc., Mary Michnick, Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order A) (Walker, Georgianne) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (jjm).
November 27, 2023 Filing 31 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Bruce Hyde (Stephenson, Michael) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (jjm).
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting STIPULATION #29 for extension of time to answer; defendants St. Joseph County, Buckner, Hasbrouck, Kindig, Schrader, Back, Howe, Chobot and Mohney's answers due 12/8/2023; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 20, 2023 Filing 29 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File First Responsive Pleading by defendants Cody Back, Kitty Buckner, Brian Chobot, Jim Hasbrouck, Tiffany Howe, Paul Kindig, James Mohney, Spencer Schrader, St. Joseph, County of (Brege, Andrew)
November 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings (eod)
November 17, 2023 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. re Answer to Complaint, #26 (Walker, Georgianne)
November 17, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Three Rivers Health System, Inc., Beacon Health System, Inc., Brandy Shoup, (Walker, Georgianne) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (eod)
November 17, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE to attorney Georgianne Walker regarding recent filing #23 (pjw)
November 17, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew James Brege on behalf of defendants Cody Back, Kitty Buckner, Brian Chobot, Jim Hasbrouck, Tiffany Howe, Paul Kindig, James Mohney, Spencer Schrader, St. Joseph, County of (Brege, Andrew)
November 17, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heather Elizabeth Sumner on behalf of defendants Cody Back, Kitty Buckner, Brian Chobot, Jim Hasbrouck, Tiffany Howe, Paul Kindig, James Mohney, Spencer Schrader, St. Joseph, County of (Sumner, Heather)
November 16, 2023 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Andrea Barnard and Mary Michnick re MOTION for partial summary judgment Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #23 and MOTION for partial summary judgment and Proposed Order #22 (Walker, Georgianne) Modified filers on 11/17/2023 (pjw)
November 16, 2023 Filing 23 BRIEF in support of MOTION for partial summary disposition by defendants Andrea Barnard and Mary Michnick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Walker, Georgianne) Modified text and filers on 11/17/2023 (pjw)
November 16, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for partial summary disposition by defendants Andrea Barnard and Mary Michnick (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walker, Georgianne) Modified filers on 11/17/2023 (pjw)
November 8, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed; Travis McClintock served on 10/29/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed; Regan R. Avery served on 10/29/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed; Brandy Shoup served on 10/29/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed; Andrea Barnard served on 10/29/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed; Mary Michnick served on 10/29/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed; Cody Back served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed; Kitty Buckner served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Spencer Schrader served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Paul Kindig served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Brian Chobot served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; James Mohney served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Tiffany Howe served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Jim Hasbrouck served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Covered Bridge Healthcare of St. Joseph County, Inc. served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; St. Joseph, County of served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (Dworetsky, David)
November 2, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Georgianne Marie Walker on behalf of defendants Andrea Barnard, Beacon Health System, Inc., Mary Michnick, Brandy Shoup, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. (Walker, Georgianne)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Regan R. Avery, Cody Back, Andrea Barnard, Beacon Health System, Inc., Kitty Buckner, Brian Chobot, Covered Bridge Healthcare of St. Joseph County, Inc., Jim Hasbrouck, Tiffany Howe, Bruce Hyde, Kalamazoo Emergency Associates, PLC, Paul Kindig, Travis McClintock, Mary Michnick, James Mohney, Spencer Schrader, Brandy Shoup, St. Joseph, County of, Three Rivers Health System, Inc. (eod)
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 CORRECTED NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 11/13/2023 (eod) Modified text on 10/23/2023 (eod)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 (DISREGARD) NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 11/13/2023 (eod) Modified text on 10/23/2023; replaced by #5 (eod)
October 23, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Howard Linden in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7194958 (Dworetsky, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Dworetsky, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Howard Linden (Dworetsky, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Howard Linden (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Merit - Dr. Goldstein, #2 Affidavit of Merit - Dr. Cichon, #3 Affidavit of Merit - Tracry Christy, RN) (Dworetsky, David) Modified text on 10/23/2023 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linden v. St. Joseph, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Linden
Represented By: David A. Dworetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard T. Linden
Represented By: David A. Dworetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ST. JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Cody Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Kitty Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Spencer Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Paul Kindig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy James Mohney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Tiffany Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jim Hasbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covered Bridge Healthcare of St. Joseph County, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Benham Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Bruce Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Regan Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THREE RIVERS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. d/b/a THREE RIVERS HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEACON HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. d/b/a THREE RIVERS HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALAMAZOO EMERGENCY ASSOCIATES, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Brandy Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Andrea Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Mary Michnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Travis McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Brian Chobot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph, County of
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Back
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty Buckner
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Schrader
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kindig
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Chobot
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mohney
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Howe
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hasbrouck
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Hyde
Represented By: Michael W. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regan R. Avery
Represented By: Patrick Benham Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Rivers Health System, Inc. jointly and severally doing business as Three Rivers Health
Represented By: Georgianne Marie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Health System, Inc. jointly and severally doing business as Three Rivers Health
Represented By: Georgianne Marie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Shoup
Represented By: Georgianne Marie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Barnard
Represented By: Georgianne Marie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Michnick
Represented By: Georgianne Marie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?