Farmer v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Russell Farmer
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01160
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE adjourning without date 12/21/2023 Rule 16 scheduling conference (rmw)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER scheduling settlement conference: early settlement conference set for 1/16/2024 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Brugess, George)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/21/2023 at 11:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 12/14/2023; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company (O'Donnell, Mary)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Defendant file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
November 1, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
November 1, 2023 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Illinois Northern, their case number 1:23-cv-10333; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ns)
November 1, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mary C. O'Donnell on behalf of defendant Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company (O'Donnell, Mary)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Michigan the electronic record. (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue #9 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/30/2023. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion to stay proceedings and refer case to magistrate judge for settlement conference #10 is denied. Status hearing previously set for 11/14/23 and the deadline for the joint status report are stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company to stay (Unopposed) (Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company to transfer case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Craig Lantagne Affidavit)(Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company (Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company by James Daniel Helenhouse (Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing set for 11/14/23 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 11/9/23. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 JURY Demand (Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company(Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company by James Daniel Helenhouse (Helenhouse, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
September 18, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
September 18, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company on 9/12/2023 by Plaintiff Russell Farmer. Waiver of service due by 10/27/2023. (Brugess, George) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Russell Farmer; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21055566. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brugess, George) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/1/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Farmer
Represented By: George T. Brugess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: James D. Helenhouse
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?