Utica Leaseco, LLC v. JW Equipment, LLC
Plaintiff: Utica Leaseco, LLC
Defendant: JW Equipment, LLC
Cross Defendant: Dennis A. Boersen and Boersen Farms & Affiliates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01366
Filed: December 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by third-party plaintiff JW Equipment, LLC, defendant JW Equipment, LLC for Summons, Third-Party Complaint & Reliance on Jury Demand on Dennis Boersen (Vredenburg, Andrew)
February 23, 2024 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE by third-party plaintiff JW Equipment, LLC, defendant JW Equipment, LLC for Summons, Third-Party Complaint and Reliance on Jury Demand on Boersen Farms & Affiliates, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adjourning 3/5/2024 Rule 16 scheduling conference pending further order of the court; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by third-party plaintiff JW Equipment, LLC, defendant JW Equipment, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to third-party defendants Dennis A. Boersen, Boersen Farms & Affiliates, LLC (ns)
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Boersen Farms & Affiliates, LLC, Dennis Boersen filed by JW Equipment, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Third Party Complaint, #2 Summons Third Party Complaint Summons to Boersen Farms, #3 Summons Third Party Complaint Summons to Dennis Boersen) (Vredenburg, Andrew) Modified text on 2/20/2024 (ns).
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 3/5/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 2/29/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 7, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Boersen Farms & Affiliates, LLC and Dennis Boersen by defendant JW Equipment, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
February 7, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by JW Equipment, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
February 7, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JW Equipment, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant to file responsive pleadings to complaint extended to 2/8/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on Behalf of Defendant JW Equipment, LLC by defendant JW Equipment, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
January 23, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew C. Vredenburg on behalf of defendant JW Equipment, LLC (Vredenburg, Andrew)
January 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED re JW Equipment, LLC served on 1/4/2024, answer due 1/25/2024 (Ronayne, Louis) Modified text on 1/12/2024 (ns).
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant JW Equipment, LLC (jrg)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Ronayne, Louis)
December 29, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Utica Leaseco, LLC (Ronayne, Louis)
December 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (eod)
December 29, 2023 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant JW Equipment, LLC (none provided) (eod)
December 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against JW Equipment, LLC filed by Utica Leaseco, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T) (Ronayne, Louis)
December 28, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Utica Leaseco, LLC in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7254622 (Ronayne, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utica Leaseco, LLC v. JW Equipment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utica Leaseco, LLC
Represented By: Louis Francis Ronayne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JW Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Andrew C. Vredenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dennis A. Boersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Boersen Farms & Affiliates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?