Hague v. Kent, County of et al
Plaintiff: Jannah Hague
Defendant: Kent County, Michelle LaJoye-Young, Kent County Sheriff's Office and Kent, County of
Case Number: 1:2024cv00009
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting STIPULATION #14 to respond to motion to dismiss #10 by 4/1/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
February 29, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff To Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 10) by plaintiff Jannah Hague (Doukoure, Amy)
February 29, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Neil Youngdahl on behalf of defendants Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young (Youngdahl, Neil)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 3/26/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
February 26, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young (Vogan, Joseph)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #10 filed by Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lyndsie Cole) (Vogan, Joseph)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss with certificate of compliance by defendants Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young; (Vogan, Joseph) Modified text on 2/27/2024 (mg).
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Kent County Sheriff's Office served on 1/11/2024, answer due 2/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Doukoure, Amy) Modified text on 2/1/2024 (slk).
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Michelle LaJoye-Young served on 1/11/2024, answer due 2/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Doukoure, Amy) Modified text on 2/1/2024 (slk).
February 1, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Kent, County of served on 1/11/2024, answer due 2/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Doukoure, Amy) Modified text on 2/1/2024 (slk).
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting STIPULATION #5 extending answer deadline to 2/26/2024 and requiring proof of service to be filed by 2/07/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
January 31, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION Regarding Response Time by defendants Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young (Eagle, Timothy)
January 31, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy E. Eagle on behalf of defendants Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young (Eagle, Timothy)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Kent County Sheriff's Office, Kent, County of, Michelle LaJoye-Young (ns)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (ns)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doukoure, Amy)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Jannah Hague (Doukoure, Amy)
January 3, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jannah Hague in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7257487 (Doukoure, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hague v. Kent, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannah Hague
Represented By: Amy Doukoure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle LaJoye-Young
Represented By: Joseph J. Vogan
Represented By: Neil Youngdahl
Represented By: Timothy E. Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Joseph J. Vogan
Represented By: Neil Youngdahl
Represented By: Timothy E. Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent, County of
Represented By: Joseph J. Vogan
Represented By: Neil Youngdahl
Represented By: Timothy E. Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?