Alshimary #342578 v. Unknown Party #1 et al
Plaintiff: Abdul Alshimary #342578
Defendant: Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4, Unknown Party #5, Unknown Party #6, Unknown Bigelow, Unknown Garcia, Unknown London, Unknown Rydahl, Unknown Lebo, Unknown Eerdmans and Unknown Blount
Case Number: 1:2024cv00037
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint; denying #8 Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee balance or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 4/8/2024 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
March 11, 2024 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #15 , Deficiency Order #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Abdul Alshimary #342578 (ems)
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Unknown Bigelow, Unknown Blount, Unknown Eerdmans, Unknown Garcia, Unknown Lebo, Unknown London, Unknown Rydahl, Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4, Unknown Party #5, Unknown Party #6 filed by Abdul Alshimary #342578 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
March 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis by plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578; (ems)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #9 assigning CASE NUMBER 24-1145 (ems)
February 22, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER from plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578 requesting copy; courtesy copy of Complaint #1 mailed to plaintiff on 2/22/24 (ems)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re #5 by plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578 (ems)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578; (ems)
February 8, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to amend/correct #1 by plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578; (ems)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REJECTING Letter to Judge Berens submitted by Tausha Richards; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (jln)
February 6, 2024 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #6 with original document sent via U.S. Mail to Tausha Richards (klb)
February 6, 2024 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #6 (order only) sent via U.S. Mail to Abdul Alshimary #342578 (ems)
February 1, 2024 Copy of Order on Motion to Supplement #5 with Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Form sent via U.S. Mail to Abdul Alshimary #342578 (ems)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Plaintiff's motion to supplement and directing the filing of an amended complaint to remove allegations regarding an improperly named plaintiff; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to supplement #1 to add claims and defendants by plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578; (ems)
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Abdul Alshimary #342578 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ems)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 2/2/2024 (ems)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4 filed by Abdul Alshimary #342578 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
January 12, 2024 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $350.00, receipt number 100003681; amount paid to date $350.00 (ems)
January 12, 2024 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Abdul Alshimary #342578 (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alshimary #342578 v. Unknown Party #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Alshimary #342578
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rydahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Eerdmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?