3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC v. Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc.
Plaintiff: 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC, d and 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as T-SIM Solutions
Defendant: Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. and Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. a division of Dover Energy, Inc., a Delaware Corporation doing business as DE-STA-CO
Other: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2024cv00045
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 501126 as to defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (jmw)
March 1, 2024 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 309898 as to plaintiff 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC (jmw)
February 29, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 3/7/2024 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 3/7/2024 (kmd)
February 29, 2024 Filing 15 SELECTION of Lee Silver as facilitative mediator by plaintiff 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC (Muth, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: not recorded) (rmw)
February 13, 2024 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Portinga, D.)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at 602 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 2/13/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC (Portinga, D.)
February 1, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey G. Muth on behalf of plaintiff 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC (Muth, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2024 Filing 9 Defendant DPPS' ANSWER to complaint #1 by Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC (Portinga, D.)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #5 ; the time for Defendant to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including 1/31/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
January 23, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of plaintiff 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC (Portinga, D.)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
January 22, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Essence Patterson on behalf of defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Patterson, Essence)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) with Exhibits A-B; Copy of Notice of Removal with Exhibits by defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick) Modified text on 1/18/2024 (mlc)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re notice of filing notice of removal (mlc)
January 18, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Larry Rawsthorne on behalf of defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
January 18, 2024 Remark - a copy of the notice and proof of service was served via the U.S. Mail on counsel of record for Plaintiff regarding #1 . Defendants are not deficient. (mlc) Modified text on 1/18/2024 (mlc).
January 18, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Deborah J. Swedlow on behalf of defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Swedlow, Deborah)
January 17, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 23-12322-CBB with Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Exhibit B filed by Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. (Rawsthorne, Patrick) Modified text on 1/18/2024 (mlc)
January 17, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7269801 (Rawsthorne, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC v. Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC, d
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3-D Solutions Design Service, LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as T-SIM Solutions
Represented By: Jacob Carlton
Represented By: D. Andrew Portinga
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Muth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Larry Rawsthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Pumps & Process Segment Inc. a division of Dover Energy, Inc., a Delaware Corporation doing business as DE-STA-CO
Represented By: Deborah J. Swedlow
Represented By: Essence Patterson
Represented By: Patrick Larry Rawsthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Lee T. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?