Ploeg et al v. Jenkins Estates LTD et al
Plaintiff: Johannes M. Ploeg and Hien Dao Ploeg
Defendant: Jenkins Estates LTD and David Jon Jenkins
Case Number: 1:2024cv00089
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew George Borgula on behalf of defendant David Jon Jenkins (Borgula, Matthew)
March 26, 2024 Copy of Order #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Hien Dao Ploeg (eod)
March 25, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiff Johannes M. Ploeg; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Johannes Ploeg, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19) (Ploeg, Johannes) Modified text on 3/26/2024 (eod)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding filing status of Plaintiff Hien Dao Ploeg and advising Plaintiff Johannes Ploeg of admission process for licensed attorneys; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 filed by Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19) (Ploeg, Johannes) Modified text on 3/25/2024 (slk).
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER striking and removing 14 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Seal; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
March 22, 2024 Copy of Order on Motion to Seal Document #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Hien Dao Ploeg (pjw)
March 21, 2024 Filing 14 (STRICKEN AND REMOVED) MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT #13 by plaintiffs Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Affidavit of Johannes Ploeg) (Ploeg, Johannes) Modified text on 3/22/2024 (eod) Modified access on 3/22/2024 per chambers (eod) Modified to strike and remove documents per Order #15 on 3/22/2024 (krv)
March 21, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiffs Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg; (Ploeg, Johannes) Modified text on 3/22/2024 (eod)
March 6, 2024 Copy of Order #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Hien Dao Ploeg (slk)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing as resolved #10 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE by defendants David Jon Jenkins, Jenkins Estates LTD to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Hatch, Daniel)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants Jenkins Estates LTD and David Jon Jenkins to show cause by 3/4/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
February 26, 2024 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Hien Dao Ploeg (mg)
February 9, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Johannes M. Ploeg and Hien Dao Ploeg as to Jenkins Estates LTD waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024 [Attorney Daniel J. Hatch added to party Jenkins Estates LTD(pty:dft)] (Hatch, Daniel) Modified text on 2/12/2024 (mg).
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David Jon Jenkins as to David Jon Jenkins waiver sent on 2/9/2024, answer due 4/9/2024 [Attorney Daniel J. Hatch added to party David Jon Jenkins(pty:dft)] (Hatch, Daniel)
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; David Jon Jenkins served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024 (Ploeg, Johannes)
February 5, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Jenkins Estates LTD served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024 (Ploeg, Johannes)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 pro se application for electronic filing and service; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
February 1, 2024 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Johannes M. Ploeg and Hien Dao Ploeg (slk)
February 1, 2024 Copy of Order on Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Johannes M. Ploeg and Hien Dao Ploeg (slk) Modified text on 2/1/2024 (slk).
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
January 31, 2024 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Johannes M. Ploeg and Hien Dao Ploeg (pjw)
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Johannes M. Ploeg (pjw)
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against David Jon Jenkins, Jenkins Estates LTD filed by Johannes M. Ploeg, Hien Dao Ploeg (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjw)
January 30, 2024 RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number 100003795 for filing fee (pjw)
January 30, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants David Jon Jenkins, Jenkins Estates LTD (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ploeg et al v. Jenkins Estates LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johannes M. Ploeg
Represented By: Johannes M. Ploeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hien Dao Ploeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Estates LTD
Represented By: Daniel J. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jon Jenkins
Represented By: Matthew George Borgula
Represented By: Daniel J. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?