Lee v. United States Department of Treasury
Plaintiff: Keshia Marie Lee
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Case Number: 1:2024cv00153
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE re #1 from Michigan Department of State re Uniform Commercial Code as to Keshia Lee Estate (pjw)
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled Statement of Facts and Affidavit of Subpoena) by plaintiff Keshia Marie Lee (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (pjw)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in support re #1 (titled Affidavit in Fact) filed by plaintiff Keshia Marie Lee (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)
February 29, 2024 CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Keshia Marie Lee to Keshia Marie Lee 7461 Crowner Dr., A0061 Dimondale, MI 48821 as taken from #6 ; remailed #3 , #4 and #5 (pjw)
February 21, 2024 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Keshia Marie Lee (jlg)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
February 20, 2024 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 , Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Keshia Marie Lee (eod)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Treasury filed by Keshia Marie Lee (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment -Civil Cover Sheet) (pjw) Modified text on 2/20/2024 (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshia Marie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?