Christian #815288 v. Rewerts et al
Plaintiff: James Christian #815288
Defendant: Randee Rewerts, Unknown Gregory, Unknown Bigalow, K. Smith, S. Kurts, Unknown Hawkins, Unknown Nevins, Unknown Garcia, Unknown Smith, Unknown Nevis and Unknown Mates
Case Number: 1:2024cv00159
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James Christian #815288 (slk)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from James Christian #815288 requesting copy of #1 and amended complaint forms; remailed amended complaint forms and courtesy copy of #1 (mg)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff James Christian #815288 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (mg)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Antonio Maurice Jolly #922447 and James Christian #815288 with their respective docket sheet and amended 1983 complaint forms (mg)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that that the Clerk of Court shall sever the claims of the two plaintiffsinto separate actions; directing the filing parties to each submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; Plaintiff Jolly shall, within 28 days, in his action, submit the $405.00 filing fees or, alternatively, file the required documents to proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff Christian is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff James Christian #815288 regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 2/23/2024 (mlc)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff Antonio Maurice Jolly #922447 regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 2/23/2024 (mlc) Modified text on 2/2/2024 (mlc)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 , Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Antonio Maurice Jolly #922447 and James Christian #815288 (mlc)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiffs James Christian #815288, Antonio Maurice Jolly #922447; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents for James Christian #815288) (mlc) Modified text on 2/2/2024 (mlc)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand for compensatory and punitive relief against All Defendants filed by James Christian #815288, Antonio Maurice Jolly #922447 (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian #815288 v. Rewerts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Christian #815288
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randee Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bigalow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kurts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nevis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?