Preston #235170 v. Rewerts et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Preston #235170
Defendant: Randee Rewerts, Unknown Garcia, Unknown Nevins, Unknown Smith, Unknown Allen, Unknown Ward, Unknown Jones, B. Bellinger and Unknown Peterson
Case Number: 1:2024cv00245
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Denying IFP) ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Order #10 , Opinion (Screening) #9 , Judgment Dismissing Case #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 (mg)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings (mg)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 (mg)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/1/2024 (mg)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 4:24-cv-10555; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (mg)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 (mg)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/11/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MSyl) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/11/2024.]
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (MCho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/11/2024.]
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Harvey Lee Preston. (MCho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/11/2024.]
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Harvey Lee Preston against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MCho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/11/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston #235170 v. Rewerts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Preston #235170
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randee Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Bellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?