United States of America v. $7,967.67 from Michigan State University Federal Credit Union Account Ending 8960
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $7,967.67 from Michigan State University Federal Credit Union Account Ending 8960
Case Number: 1:2024cv00255
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to Known Potential Claimants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Document) (McGraw, Daniel)
March 29, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff United States of America for Warrant for Arrest in Rem (McGraw, Daniel)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (mg)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 CASE ASSIGNMENT REVIEW indicating the cases are related; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 of Complaint for Forfeiture by plaintiff United States of America (McGraw, Daniel)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 of Related Case by plaintiff United States of America (McGraw, Daniel)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem against $7,967.67 from Michigan State University Federal Credit Union Account Ending 8960 filed by United States of America (McGraw, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $7,967.67 from Michigan State University Federal Credit Union Account Ending 8960
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel T. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,967.67 from Michigan State University Federal Credit Union Account Ending 8960
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?