Labadie #219886 v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Kirk Wayne Labadie #219886
Defendant: Douglas Mitchell, Brian A. Peppler and Chippewa, County of
Case Number: 2:2014cv00023
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
Presiding Judge: Timothy P. Greeley
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 OPINION AND ORDER; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 54 , denying 49 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; denying as moot 52 defendants' motion to strike plaintiff's motion for summary judgment ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 35 , granting plaintiff's motion to supplement 36 , granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion for summary judgment 26 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labadie #219886 v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Wayne Labadie #219886
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Peppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chippewa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?