Moore #255379 v. Larson et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Lamont Moore #255379
Defendant: Unknown Davis
Case Number: 2:2015cv00140
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
County: Gogebic
Presiding Judge: Timothy P. Greeley
Presiding Judge: Gordon J. Quist
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 87 , plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 79 is denied; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (kvt)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 34 re 25 : Defendant's Motion 25 for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore #255379 v. Larson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lamont Moore #255379
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?