Weatherspoon #471817 v. Strahan et al
Plaintiff: Morris Weatherspoon #471817
Defendant: Kim Esslin, John Thibault and Michael McDowell
Case Number: 2:2016cv00263
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
County: Baraga
Presiding Judge: Timothy P. Greeley
Presiding Judge: Gordon J. Quist
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 114 ; Defendant's motion for summary judgment 93 is granted; case is concluded; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (jas)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 74 re 67 : Defendant Strahan's Motion for Summary Judgment 67 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 75 is DENIED; case closed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 44 re 39 , 37 , 34 , 29 , 32 , 41 : Defendants' Motion 29 is GRANTED; case to continue against Defendant Strahan; Defendants' Motions 37 39 41 are DENIED AS MOOT; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 36 re 15 : Plaintiff's Motion 15 for Injunctive Relief is DENIED; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherspoon #471817 v. Strahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Weatherspoon #471817
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Esslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thibault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?