United States of America v. Ironwood, City of

Plaintiff: United States Environmental Protection Agency and United States of America
Defendant: Ironwood, City of
Case Number: 2:2018cv00195
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Timothy P Greeley
1 Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re entry of Consent Decree; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
December 22, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT DECREE; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for entry of judgment (Consent Decree) #5 filed by United States of America (Grady, Lauren)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Entry of Judgment #5 (Consent Decree) filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Federal Register Notice) (Grady, Lauren)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for entry of judgment (Consent Decree) by plaintiff United States of America; (Grady, Lauren)
November 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy M. Dean on behalf of defendant Ironwood, City of (Dean, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 1, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Ironwood, City of (Summons Not Provided) (mlc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lodging of Consent Decree by plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree) (Grady, Lauren) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (jlg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America (Grady, Lauren) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ironwood, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Lauren D. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lauren D. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironwood, City of
Represented By: Timothy M. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?