Tippins #342855 v. Bauman

Petitioner: Johnny Tippins #342855
Respondent: Catherine S. Bauman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #12 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Johnny Tippins (mlc)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REJECTING Supplement to Proposed 2241 Habeas Corpus Writ submitted by Johnny Tippins #342855 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Attachments: #1 Rejected Document) (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
February 20, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Johnny Tippins (mlc)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 motion to amend petition; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to amend/correct #1 by petitioner Johnny Tippins #342855; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Proposed State Documents, #3 Proposed State Documents (Continued), #4 Proposed State Documents (Continued), #5 Proposed State Documents (Continued), #6 Proposed State Documents (Continued), #7 Cover Letter) (mlc)
January 30, 2019 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #7 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #8 , Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Johnny Tippins (slk)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION; Judgment and Order to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from petitioner Johnny Tippins #342855 regarding status of case; and change of address to Chippewa Correctional Facility (per the Michigan Department of Corrections, Mr. Tippins is at Alger Correctional Facility) (mailed docket sheet and Order #5 )) (slk)
January 17, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Johnny Tippins #342855 (ns)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 by petitioner Johnny Tippins #342855 (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Page 9 and Exhibit) (mlc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from petitioner Johnny Tippins #342855 regarding petitioner unable to provide copies of exhibits to the Court and wanting forms (mailed 28 U.S.C. 2241 forms to petitioner) (mlc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Johnny Tippins #342855; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Johnny Tippins #342855 (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Exhibits) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tippins #342855 v. Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Tippins #342855
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine S. Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?