Richards #641715 v. Lesatz
Petitioner: Kyle B. Richards #641715
Respondent: Daniel Lesatz
Case Number: 2:2019cv00034
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
2 Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #13 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #15 , Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (mlc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 15, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (TPG), #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (mlc)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-024, Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley is no longer assigned to the case (krv)
February 22, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP on Appeal - Habeas #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (mlc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: petitioner may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an appeal fee; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (mlc).
February 20, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (mlc)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 motion to appoint counsel ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Kyle B. Richards #641715 requesting subpoena to be issued (ns)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #6 by petitioner Kyle B. Richards #641715 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ns)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to appoint counsel by petitioner Kyle B. Richards #641715; (mlc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity with 6 months of prisoner trust account statements submitted by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
February 6, 2019 Copy of Deficiency Order, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (mlc)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 3/5/2019 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner Kyle B. Richards #641715 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 (mlc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to compel Certified Institutional Account Statement by petitioner Kyle B. Richards #641715; (mlc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Kyle B. Richards #641715; (mlc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Kyle B. Richards #641715 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards #641715 v. Lesatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle B. Richards #641715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Lesatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?