Gomez #800517 v. Kowalski
Petitioner: Luz J. Gomez #800517
Respondent: Jack Kowalski
Case Number: 2:2019cv00040
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
2 Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #4 , Judgment #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Luz J. Gomez (slk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Respondent against Petitioner; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #2 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 15, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (TPG), #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Luz J. Gomez (slk)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-024, Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley is no longer assigned to the case (krv)
February 25, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation (Screening) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Luz J. Gomez (slk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 that the petition be denied ; objections to R&R due within 14 days ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
February 8, 2019 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number MQ005740 (slk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Luz J. Gomez #800517 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez #800517 v. Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jack Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luz J. Gomez #800517
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?