Pepin v. Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Plaintiff: David Pepin
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00042
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 5/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 5/17/2019 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendant Wisconsin Central Ltd. file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-024, Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley is no longer assigned to the case (kvt)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Wisconsin Central Ltd. (O'Donnell, Mary) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (kvt).
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Wisconsin Central Ltd. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019 (Wilensky, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Benjamin J. Wilensky on behalf of plaintiff David Pepin (Wilensky, Benjamin)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Wisconsin Central Ltd. (mlc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mlc)
February 12, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff David Pepin in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4360963 (Pearlman, Arvin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Wisconsin Central Ltd. filed by David Pepin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Pearlman, Arvin) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepin v. Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pepin
Represented By: Arvin J. Pearlman
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?