Moody et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Donald Moody and Rebecca Moody
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00119
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from California Northern District, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:19-cv-04015 (jlg)
July 10, 2019 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California under their case number MDL 2741 (mlc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, Roundup Products Liability Litigation (mlc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, Roundup Products Liability Litigation (slk)
July 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Adam John Brody on behalf of plaintiffs Donald Moody, Rebecca Moody (Brody, Adam)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Monsanto Company (slk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk) Modified filing date on 6/25/2019 (slk).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from Southern Division 1:19-cv-496, to Northern Division per Administrative Order 11-035; all future filings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER of 2:19-cv-119 (jlg)
June 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Donald Moody, Rebecca Moody in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4466974 (Doyle, Brion)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doyle, Brion)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company filed by Donald Moody, Rebecca Moody (Doyle, Brion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moody
Represented By: Brion Bannon Doyle
Represented By: Adam John Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Moody
Represented By: Brion Bannon Doyle
Represented By: Adam John Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?