Meyers v. Superior Title et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Meyers
Defendant: Superior Title and Scott Zueske
Case Number: 2:2019cv00179
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendants Superior Title, Scott Zueske (Linz, Nicholas)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 11/21/2019 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Superior Title, Scott Zueske (Linz, Nicholas)
October 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nicholas J. Linz on behalf of defendants Superior Title, Scott Zueske (Linz, Nicholas)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kathy Meyers as to Superior Title waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Scott Zueske waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/11/2019 (Kennedy, Katherine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Scott Zueske (slk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Superior Title (slk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (slk)
September 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kathy Meyers in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4534136 (Kennedy, Katherine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS for Scott Zueske by plaintiff Kathy Meyers (Kennedy, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (slk).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS for Superior Title by plaintiff Kathy Meyers (Kennedy, Katherine) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (slk).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Superior Title, Scott Zueske filed by Kathy Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue Letter) (Kennedy, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Superior Title et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Meyers
Represented By: Katherine Smith Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Title
Represented By: Nicholas J. Linz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Zueske
Represented By: Nicholas J. Linz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?